Rodowicz v. Stein et al
Plaintiff: Carter Rodowicz
Defendant: Jeffrey Stein and Jeffrey W. Stein
Case Number: 3:2020cv00710
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 USM 285 forms together with Notice of Lawsuit/Request for Waiver of Service, Complaint, Standing Orders, Order granting IFP reviewed and sent to the USM Office in Bridgeport for service on defendants. (Fanelle, N.)
June 4, 2020 Filing 9 Consent to Electronic Notice by Carter Rodowicz (Freberg, B)
May 28, 2020 Filing 8 USM 285 forms together with Notice of Lawsuit/Request for Waiver of Service of Summons and all instructions mailed to IFP plaintiff to complete and return to Clerk's office. (Freberg, B)
May 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #5 Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Carter Rodowicz, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Carter Rodowicz, 6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 5/28/2020.(Freberg, B)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/28/2020. (Freberg, B)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/21/2020.(Freberg, B)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/21/2020.(Freberg, B)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/20/2020; Discovery due by 11/20/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 12/25/2020. Signed by Clerk on 5/21/2020.(Freberg, B)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carter Rodowicz. (Freberg, B)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jeffrey Stein(As Trustee), Jeffrey Stein(Esq.), Jeffrey W. Stein, filed by Carter Rodowicz. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodowicz v. Stein et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey W. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carter Rodowicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?