Byrne et al v. Charter Communications, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jason Weber, David Kleuskens, Randall Byrne, Jerry Henry and Susan Foster-Harper
Defendant: Charter Communications Operating, LLC, Charter Communications, Inc., Charter Communications Holdings, LLC and Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00712
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #30 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Judson Brown. Certificate of Good Standing due by 9/15/2020. Signed by Clerk on 07/17/2020. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #27 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Daniel T. Donovan. Certificate of Good Standing due by 9/15/2020. Signed by Clerk on 07/17/2020. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
July 16, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Charter Communications Holdings, LLC, Charter Communications Operating LLC, Charter Communications, Inc. and Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC to 8/3/2020. (Barry, Donna)
July 16, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Avery S. Halfon on behalf of Randall Byrne, Susan Foster-Harper, Jerry Henry, David Kleuskens, Jason Weber (Halfon, Avery)
July 16, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Roger N. Heller on behalf of Randall Byrne, Susan Foster-Harper, Jerry Henry, David Kleuskens, Jason Weber (Heller, Roger)
July 16, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Sobol on behalf of Randall Byrne, Susan Foster-Harper, Jerry Henry, David Kleuskens, Jason Weber (Sobol, Michael)
July 16, 2020 Filing 31 AFFIDAVIT re #30 MOTION for Attorney(s) Judson Brown, P.C. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5977608) Signed By Judson Brown, P.C. filed by Charter Communications Holdings, LLC, Charter Communications Operating LLC, Charter Communications, Inc., Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC. (Bradley, Trevor)
July 16, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for Attorney(s) Judson Brown, P.C. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5977608) by Charter Communications Holdings, LLC, Charter Communications Operating LLC, Charter Communications, Inc., Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC. (Bradley, Trevor)
July 16, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Karl Lukacs on behalf of Randall Byrne, Susan Foster-Harper, Jerry Henry, David Kleuskens, Jason Weber (Lukacs, Paul)
July 16, 2020 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT re #27 MOTION for Attorney(s) Daniel T. Donovan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5977584) Signed By Daniel T. Donovan filed by Charter Communications Holdings, LLC, Charter Communications Operating LLC, Charter Communications, Inc., Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC. (Bradley, Trevor)
July 16, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Attorney(s) Daniel T. Donovan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5977584) by Charter Communications Holdings, LLC, Charter Communications Operating LLC, Charter Communications, Inc., Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC. (Bradley, Trevor)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ELECTRONIC ORDER. Defendants' #25 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED, absent objection. Defendants must now respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint on or before August 3, 2020. Future motions for extensions of time should also explain why "the time limitation in question cannot reasonably be met despite the diligence of the party seeking the extension," in accordance with Local Rule 7(b)(1). Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on July 16, 2020. (Gitlin, A.)
July 15, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time until August 3, 2020 to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Charter Communications Holdings, LLC, Charter Communications Operating LLC, Charter Communications, Inc., Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC. (Bradley, Trevor)
July 15, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor Loomis Bradley on behalf of Charter Communications Holdings, LLC, Charter Communications Operating LLC, Charter Communications, Inc., Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC (Bradley, Trevor)
July 15, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian E. Moran on behalf of Charter Communications Holdings, LLC, Charter Communications Operating LLC, Charter Communications, Inc., Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC (Moran, Brian)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Daniel M. Hattis. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/30/2020. Signed by Clerk on 07/01/2020. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
June 30, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Attorney(s) Daniel M. Hattis to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5945851) by Randall Byrne, Susan Foster-Harper, Jerry Henry, David Kleuskens, Jason Weber. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Daniel M. Hattis)(Cuthbertson, Hugh)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Paul Karl Lukacs. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/29/2020. Signed by Clerk on 06/30/2020. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
June 29, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney(s) Paul Karl Lukacs to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5943191) by Randall Byrne, Susan Foster-Harper, Jerry Henry, David Kleuskens, Jason Weber. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Paul Karl Lukacs)(Cuthbertson, Hugh)
June 25, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Charter Communications, Inc. waiver sent on 5/21/2020, answer due 7/20/2020; Charter Communications Holdings, LLC waiver sent on 5/21/2020, answer due 7/20/2020; Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC waiver sent on 5/21/2020, answer due 7/20/2020; Charter Communications Operating LLC waiver sent on 5/21/2020, answer due 7/20/2020 filed by Randall Byrne; Susan Foster-Harper; Jerry Henry; David Kleuskens; Jason Weber. (Seltz, Daniel)
June 23, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Daniel E. Seltz to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5879084) by Randall Byrne, Susan Foster-Harper, Jerry Henry, David Kleuskens, Jason Weber. (Seltz, Daniel)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael W. Sobol. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/17/2020. Signed by Clerk on 06/18/2020. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Avery S. Halfon. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/17/2020. Signed by Clerk on 06/18/2020. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Roger N. Heller. Certificate of Good Standing due by 8/17/2020. Signed by Clerk on 06/18/2020. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
June 16, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael W. Sobol to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5919342) by Randall Byrne, Susan Foster-Harper, Jerry Henry, David Kleuskens, Jason Weber. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Michael W. Sobol)(Cuthbertson, Hugh)
June 16, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Avery S. Halfon to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5919334) by Randall Byrne, Susan Foster-Harper, Jerry Henry, David Kleuskens, Jason Weber. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Avery S. Halfon)(Cuthbertson, Hugh)
June 16, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Roger N. Heller to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5919302) by Randall Byrne, Susan Foster-Harper, Jerry Henry, David Kleuskens, Jason Weber. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Roger N. Heller)(Cuthbertson, Hugh)
May 28, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel E. Seltz on behalf of Randall Byrne, Susan Foster-Harper, Jerry Henry, David Kleuskens, Jason Weber (Seltz, Daniel)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Daniel E. Seltz. Certificate of Good Standing due by 7/27/2020. Signed by Clerk on 05/28/2020. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
May 27, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney(s) Daniel E. Seltz to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5879084) by Randall Byrne, Susan Foster-Harper, Jerry Henry, David Kleuskens, Jason Weber. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Daniel E. Seltz)(Cuthbertson, Hugh)
May 22, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Randall Byrne, Susan Foster-Harper, Jerry Henry, David Kleuskens, Jason Weber. (Cuthbertson, Hugh)
May 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven C. Rickman on behalf of Randall Byrne, Susan Foster-Harper, Jerry Henry, David Kleuskens, Jason Weber (Rickman, Steven)
May 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Hugh W. Cuthbertson on behalf of Randall Byrne, Susan Foster-Harper, Jerry Henry, David Kleuskens, Jason Weber (Cuthbertson, Hugh)
May 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by David Kleuskens, Randall Byrne, Susan Foster-Harper, Jason Weber, Jerry Henry Signed by Clerk on 05/21/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr on 05/21/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/20/2020 Discovery due by 11/20/2020 Dispositive Motions due by 12/25/2020 Signed by Clerk on 05/21/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
May 21, 2020 Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr added. (Oliver, T.)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5871937.), filed by Jerry Henry, David Kleuskens, Randall Byrne, Jason Weber, Susan Foster-Harper. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cuthbertson, Hugh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byrne et al v. Charter Communications, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Weber
Represented By: Hugh W. Cuthbertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Kleuskens
Represented By: Hugh W. Cuthbertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Byrne
Represented By: Hugh W. Cuthbertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Henry
Represented By: Hugh W. Cuthbertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Foster-Harper
Represented By: Hugh W. Cuthbertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications Operating, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectrum Management Holding Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?