Beermann v. Tauck Inc
Plaintiff: JON BEERMANN
Defendant: TAUCK, INC. D/B/A TAUCK WORLD DISCOVERY
Case Number: 3:2020cv00713
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2020 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/21/2020. (Gutierrez, Y.)
July 7, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey L. Ment on behalf of Tauck Inc (Ment, Jeffrey)
June 22, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #7 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael J. Freed, Robert J. Wozniak, Jonathan M. Jagher and Brian M. Hogan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $800 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5899260) by Jon Beermann. (Jagher, Jonathan)
June 22, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #7 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael J. Freed, Robert J. Wozniak, Jonathan M. Jagher and Brian M. Hogan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $800 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5899260) by Jon Beermann. (Hogan, Brian)
June 22, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #7 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael J. Freed, Robert J. Wozniak, Jonathan M. Jagher and Brian M. Hogan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $800 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5899260) by Jon Beermann. (Wozniak, Robert)
June 22, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #7 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael J. Freed, Robert J. Wozniak, Jonathan M. Jagher and Brian M. Hogan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $800 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5899260) by Jon Beermann. (Freed, Michael)
June 15, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian M Hogan on behalf of Jon Beermann (Hogan, Brian)
June 15, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Marc Jagher on behalf of Jon Beermann (Jagher, Jonathan)
June 15, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Wozniak, Jr on behalf of Jon Beermann (Wozniak, Robert)
June 15, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Freed on behalf of Jon Beermann (Freed, Michael)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Certificates of Good Standing due by 8/10/2020. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 6/11/2020. (Freberg, B)
June 8, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jon Beermann re #6 Electronic Summons Issued, (Shapiro, Jonathan)
June 5, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael J. Freed, Robert J. Wozniak, Jonathan M. Jagher and Brian M. Hogan to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $800 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5899260) by Jon Beermann. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Michael Freed, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Robert Wozniak, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of Jonathan Jagher, #4 Affidavit Affidavit of Brian Hogan)(Shapiro, Jonathan)
May 26, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Tauck Inc* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jonathan M. Shapiro* *Aeton Law Partners LLP* *101 Centerpoint Drive, Suite 105* *Middletown, CT 06457*. (Freberg, B)
May 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Jon Beermann, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 5/26/2020.(Freberg, B)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/21/2020.(Freberg, B)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/21/2020.(Freberg, B)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/20/2020; Discovery due by 11/20/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 12/25/2020. Signed by Clerk on 5/21/2020.(Freberg, B)
May 21, 2020 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
May 21, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Tauck Inc. (Shapiro, Jonathan) Modified to update party on 5/22/2020 (Anastasio, F.).
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tauck Inc ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5871945.), filed by Jon Beermann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Shapiro, Jonathan) Modified to update parties on 5/22/2020 (Anastasio, F.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beermann v. Tauck Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JON BEERMANN
Represented By: Jonathan M. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAUCK, INC. D/B/A TAUCK WORLD DISCOVERY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?