Benoit v. Sikorsky Aircraft
Plaintiff: Josue Benoit
Defendant: Sikorsky Aircraft, A Lockheed Martin Corporation/Company and Sikorsky Aircraft
Case Number: 3:2020cv00717
Filed: May 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Initial Discovery Protocol Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 7/9/20.(Johnson, D.)
July 3, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE REPLY TO DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES filed by Josue Benoit. (Umeugo, Ikechukwu)
June 30, 2020 Filing 15 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Salazar-Austin, David)
June 29, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) With Affirmative Defenses by Sikorsky Aircraft.(Salazar-Austin, David)
May 31, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Sikorsky Aircraft to 6/29/2020. (Johnson, D.)
May 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. The #12 motion for extension is GRANTED. Defendant's responsive pleading will be due by June 29, 2020.Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 5/31/2020. (Karpman, Michael)
May 27, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 29, 2020 To Respond To Plaintiffs Complaint #1 Notice of Removal, by Sikorsky Aircraft. (Salazar-Austin, David)
May 26, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Notice (Other) filed by Sikorsky Aircraft, #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Sikorsky Aircraft, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Sikorsky Aircraft, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Sikorsky Aircraft, #10 Notice, #5 Notice (Other) filed by Sikorsky Aircraft, #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #8 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Sikorsky Aircraft, #9 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 05/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases) (Peterson, M)
May 22, 2020 Filing 10 Notice re Initial Discovery Protocols Signed by Clerk on 05/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Initial Discovery Protocol Attachment) (Peterson, M)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 05/22/2020. (Peterson, M)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 05/22/2020. (Peterson, M)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/21/2020. Discovery due by 11/21/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 12/26/2020. Signed by Clerk on 05/22/2020. (Peterson, M)
May 22, 2020 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
May 22, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sikorsky Aircraft identifying Corporate Parent Lockheed Martin Corporation/Company, Other Affiliate State Street Corporation, Other Affiliate Street Bank and Trust Company for Sikorsky Aircraft, A Lockheed Martin Corporation/Company. (Salazar-Austin, David) Modified to update party on 5/26/2020 (Anastasio, F.).
May 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Sikorsky Aircraft re #1 Notice of Removal, Defendant's Statement Regarding Removal (Salazar-Austin, David) Modified to update party on 5/26/2020 (Anastasio, F.).
May 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Sikorsky Aircraft re #1 Notice of Removal, Defendant's Notice of Pending Motions (Salazar-Austin, David) Modified to update party on 5/26/2020 (Anastasio, F.).
May 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Sikorsky Aircraft re #1 Notice of Removal, Certificate of Filing Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Notice)(Salazar-Austin, David) Modified to update party on 5/26/2020 (Anastasio, F.).
May 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David C. Salazar-Austin on behalf of Sikorsky Aircraft (Salazar-Austin, David) Modified to update party on 5/26/2020 (Anastasio, F.).
May 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sikorsky Aircraft from CT Superior Court Judicial District of Fairfield, case number FBT-CV20-6096673. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5873814, filed by Sikorsky Aircraft. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint)(Salazar-Austin, David) Modified to update party on 5/26/2020 (Anastasio, F.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benoit v. Sikorsky Aircraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sikorsky Aircraft, A Lockheed Martin Corporation/Company
Represented By: David C. Salazar-Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sikorsky Aircraft
Represented By: David C. Salazar-Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josue Benoit
Represented By: Ikechukwu Umeugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?