Steffens v. Kaminsky
Plaintiff: Kyle Arthur Steffens
Defendant: Melissa Leigh Kaminsky and Missy Galore
Case Number: 3:2020cv00737
Filed: May 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION. In light of the lack of response to the Court's order to show cause (Doc. #7 ), the Court DISMISSES this action without prejudice. The Clerk of Court shall close this case. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 06/16/2020. (Mahler-Haug, A)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY COMPLAINT SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B). For the reasons stated in the accompanying ruling, it appears that the complaint fails to state facts that give rise to plausible grounds for the exercise of federal jurisdiction. If Steffens has grounds to show why his complaint should not be dismissed, he shall file a response to this order to show cause by June 12, 2020. In the absence of a timely and satisfactory response, the Court is likely to dismiss the complaint without prejudice to Steffens' re-filing of a complaint in an appropriate state court which may have jurisdiction over this action.It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 06/02/2020. (Mahler-Haug, A)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #2 ). It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 06/02/2020. (Mahler-Haug, A)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/27/2020.(Freberg, B)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 5/29/2020.(Freberg, B)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/26/2020; Discovery due by 11/26/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 12/31/2020. Signed by Clerk on 5/27/2020.(Freberg, B)
May 27, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kyle Arthur Steffens. (Freberg, B)
May 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Melissa Leigh Kaminsky, filed by Kyle Arthur Steffens.(Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steffens v. Kaminsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Leigh Kaminsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missy Galore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Arthur Steffens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?