Rubenstein et al v. National Association of Realtors et al
Defendant: Keller Williams Realty Inc, HomeServices of America Inc, Realolgy Holdings Corp, Sotheby's International Realty Inc., MARK RUBENSTEIN, Coldwell Banker, The National Association of Realtors, JEFFERY NOLAN and Re/Max Holdings Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv00742
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Coldwell Banker, HomeServices of America Inc, National Association of Realtors, Realogy Holdings Corp, Sotheby's Investment Realty* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jeremiah N Ollennu* *Orthopaedic Injury Lawyers, LLC* *262 Marlborough Street P.O. Box 287 Ste 101* *Portland, CT 06480*. (Freberg, B)
June 4, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Ollennu, Jeremiah)
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by Jeffery Nolan, Mark Rubenstein, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 6/1/2020.(Freberg, B)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 6/1/2020.(Freberg, B)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 6/1/2020.(Freberg, B)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/31/2020; Discovery due by 12/1/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 1/5/2021. Signed by Clerk on 6/1/2020.(Freberg, B)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Mark Rubenstein and Jeffrey Nolan against Coldwell Banker, HomeServices of America Inc, Realogy Holdings Corp, Sotheby's Investment Realty, National Association of Realtors ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5888027.), filed by Mark Rubenstein, Jeffery Nolan.(Ollennu, Jeremiah) Modified on 6/1/2020 to correct parties (Hushin, Z.).
May 29, 2020 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rubenstein et al v. National Association of Realtors et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keller Williams Realty Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HomeServices of America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Realolgy Holdings Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sotheby's International Realty Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK RUBENSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coldwell Banker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The National Association of Realtors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFERY NOLAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Re/Max Holdings Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?