Saja v. Lowes Home Centers, LLC
Plaintiff: Catherine Saja
Defendant: Lowes Home Centers, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00747
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Answer deadline updated to 9/30/2020 and Rule 26(f) meeting report due by 10/6/2020 per Dkt. 15 Order. (Shafer, J.)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time until 9/30/2020 to respond to the Complaint and 10/06/2020 to file the Parties' Rule 26(f) Report. The Parties are directed to file, by 9/30/2020, either a stipulation of dismissal or a status report for review by the Court. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/31/2020. (Nault, James)
July 30, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time until 9/30/20; 10/6/20 answer or respond to the PL Complaint/Report of Parties Planning Meeting #1 Complaint by Lowes Home Centers, LLC. (Holland, Emily)
June 30, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily E Holland on behalf of Lowes Home Centers, LLC (Holland, Emily)
June 30, 2020 Answer deadline updated to 8/1/2020 per Dkt. 12 Order. (Shafer, J.)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting Defendant's #11 Consent Motion for Extension of Time until 8/1/2020 to respond to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/30/2020. (Nault, James)
June 29, 2020 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until August 1, 2020 respond to Plaintiffs Complaint #1 Complaint by Lowes Home Centers, LLC. (Napoli, Esq., Michelle)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint without prejudice to refiling by 6/29/2020. D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 7(b) requires all motions for extension of time (1) to demonstrate good cause for the extension, inclduing "a particularized showing that the time limitation in question cannot reasonably be met despite the diligence of the party seeking the extension," (2) to "include a statement of the movant that (1) the movant has inquired of all non-moving parties and there is agreement or objection to the motion, or that (2) despite diligent effort, including making the inquiry in sufficient time to afford non-movant a reasonable opportunity to respond, the movant cannot ascertain the position(s) of the non-movant(s)" and (3) to "indicate the number of motions for extension of time that have previously been filed by the movant with respect to the same time limitation." None of these requirements are met, and counsel are strongly advised to follow all local rules diligently at all times. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/25/2020. (Nault, James)
June 24, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time until August 1, 2020. To Plead #1 Complaint by Lowes Home Centers, LLC. (Napoli, Esq., Michelle)
June 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Napoli, Esq. on behalf of Lowes Home Centers, LLC (Napoli, Esq., Michelle)
June 2, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Lowes Home Centers, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Anthony A. Wallace* *394 Yale Ave.* *New Haven, CT 06515*. (Velez, F.)
June 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Catherine Saja, #5 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #4 Standing Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 6/2/2020. (Velez, F.)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/1/2020. (Velez, F.)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/1/2020. (Velez, F.)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/1/2020. (Velez, F.)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/31/2020; Discovery due by 12/1/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 1/5/2021. Signed by Clerk on 6/1/2020. (Velez, F.)
June 1, 2020 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
June 1, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Lowes Home Centers, LLC. (Wallace, Anthony)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Saja against Lowes Home Centers, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5888806.), filed by Catherine Saja.(Wallace, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saja v. Lowes Home Centers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowes Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Michelle Napoli, Esq.
Represented By: Emily E Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Saja
Represented By: Anthony A. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?