Trustees of the Bricklayers Local 1 Connecticut Health Fund et al v. Pride Construction, LLC
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Bricklayers Local 1 Connecticut Health Fund, Trustees of the International Masonry Institute, Trustees of the Bricklayers and Trowel Trades International Pension Fund, Trustees of the Bricklayers Local 1 Labor Management Cooperation Trust Fund and International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers, Local 1 Connecticut
Defendant: Pride Construction, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00748
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the International Masonry Institute, Trustees of the Bricklayers Local 1 Connecticut Health Fund, Trustees of the Bricklayers and Trowel Trades International Pension Fund, Trustees of the Bricklayers Local 1 Labor Management Cooperation Trust Fund, International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers, Local 1 Connecticut. Pride Construction, LLC served on 6/4/2020, answer due 6/25/2020. (Lovejoy, Alexander)
June 23, 2020 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/6/2020. (Perez, J.)
June 23, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Pride Construction, LLC.(Bellis, Stephen)
June 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen R. Bellis on behalf of Pride Construction, LLC (Bellis, Stephen)
June 2, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Pride Construction, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Alexander Steven Lovejoy* *Robert M. Cheverie & Associates, P.C.* *333 East River Drive Suite 101* *East Hartford, CT 06108*. (Fazekas, J.)
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint,, filed by Trustees of the International Masonry Institute, International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers, Local 1 Connecticut, Trustees of the Bricklayers Local 1 Connecticut Health Fund, Trustees of the Bricklayers and Trowel Trades International Pension Fund, Trustees of the Bricklayers Local 1 Labor Management Cooperation Trust Fund Signed by Clerk on 06/2/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 06/1/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 06/1/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/31/2020. Discovery due by 12/1/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 1/5/2021. Signed by Clerk on 06/1/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
June 1, 2020 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Oliver, T.)
June 1, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Pride Construction, LLC. (Lovejoy, Alexander)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pride Construction, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5888908.), filed by Trustees of the International Masonry Institute, Trustees of the Bricklayers Local 1 Connecticut Health Fund, Trustees of the Bricklayers and Trowel Trades International Pension Fund, Trustees of the Bricklayers Local 1 Labor Management Cooperation Trust Fund, International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers, Local 1 Connecticut.(Lovejoy, Alexander) Modified on 6/1/2020 to correct party(Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Bricklayers Local 1 Connecticut Health Fund et al v. Pride Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Bricklayers Local 1 Connecticut Health Fund
Represented By: Alexander Steven Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the International Masonry Institute
Represented By: Alexander Steven Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Bricklayers and Trowel Trades International Pension Fund
Represented By: Alexander Steven Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Bricklayers Local 1 Labor Management Cooperation Trust Fund
Represented By: Alexander Steven Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Union of Bricklayers and Allied Craftworkers, Local 1 Connecticut
Represented By: Alexander Steven Lovejoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pride Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?