Francois v. Poole
Plaintiff: Edward Francois
Defendant: Summer Poole
Case Number: 3:2020cv00770
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss or for Stay by Summer Poole.Responses due by 8/14/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certification of Service of documents, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Summer Poole, #5 Exhibit A, #6 Exhibit B, #7 Exhibit C, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit I, #14 Exhibit J)(Margolis, Stuart)
July 15, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/5/2020 (Lewis, D)
June 23, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Summer Poole to 7/24/2020. (DeRubeis, B.)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 MOTION for Extension of Time until 7/24/20 to plead 9 Summons Returned Executed, 1 Complaint, by Summer Poole. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/23/2020. (DeRubeis, B.)
June 22, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time until 7/24/20 to plead #9 Summons Returned Executed, #1 Complaint, by Summer Poole. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Margolis, Stuart)
June 22, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Stuart A. Margolis on behalf of Summer Poole (Margolis, Stuart)
June 5, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edward Francois. Summer Poole served on 6/4/2020, answer due 6/25/2020. (Hellman, Jeffrey)
June 3, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Summer Poole* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jeffrey R. Hellman* *Law Offices of Jeffrey Hellman, LLC* *195 Church Street, 10th Floor* *New Haven, CT 06510*. (Reis, Julia)
June 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by Edward Francois, #2 Jury Demand filed by Edward Francois, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Standing Protective Order, #6 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 6/3/2020. (Reis, Julia)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/3/2020. (Reis, Julia)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/3/2020. (Reis, Julia)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/3/2020. (Reis, Julia)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/2/2020. Discovery due by 12/3/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 1/7/2021. Signed by Clerk on 6/3/2020. (Reis, Julia)
June 3, 2020 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Oliver, T.)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Edward Francois. (Hellman, Jeffrey)
June 3, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Summer Poole. (Hellman, Jeffrey)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Summer Poole ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5893586.), filed by Edward Francois. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Cover Sheet)(Hellman, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Francois v. Poole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Francois
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Hellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summer Poole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?