Peterson v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Alyssa S. Peterson
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00781
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until August 5, 2020 to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Dunne, Anne)
June 30, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Dunne on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Dunne, Anne)
June 30, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Bizar, David)
June 30, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Bizar on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Bizar, David)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. SELF-REPRESENTED FILERS ARE REQUIRED TO COMPLY WITH THE JUDGE'S STANDARD ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER WHICH IS ATTACHED. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 6/29/2020. (Oliver, T.)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Participate in Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 6/29/2020. (Simon, K)
June 24, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alyssa S. Peterson. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. served on 6/12/2020, answer due 7/3/2020. (Fanelle, N.)
June 24, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION by Self-Represented Litigant to Participate in Electronic Filing by Alyssa S. Peterson. (Fanelle, N.)
June 8, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Alyssa S. Peterson* *297 Grandview Terrace* *Hartford, CT 06114* (Fazekas, J.)
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Standing Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Alyssa S. Peterson, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 06/8/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
June 8, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Fazekas, J.)
June 4, 2020 Filing fee received from Alyssa S. Peterson: $400.00, receipt number CTXH00016967. (Fazekas, J.)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 06/4/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 06/4/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/3/2020. Discovery due by 12/4/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 1/8/2021. Signed by Clerk on 06/4/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed by Alyssa S. Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(Fazekas, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyssa S. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?