Chambrello v. Wiecek et al
Plaintiff: Patricia Chambrello
Defendant: John Wiecek and Emily Wiecek
Case Number: 3:2020cv00792
Filed: June 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Continue by Emily Wiecek. (Noah, Patrice)
August 7, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A telephonic pre-settlement conference is set for 8/12/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Robert M. Spector. A date for the settlement conference will be set during the telephone call. As the Court requires parties or their representatives with settlement authority to attend (in-person or by remote means) the settlement conference, counsel should obtain dates of unavailability from their clients over the next 90 days and have their own calendars available to aid in the scheduling. During the telephone call, counsel should be prepared to discuss what information needs to be exchanged and anything else that needs to be accomplished prior to the settlement conference for the discussions to be productive. Please use the following dial-in for this call: (877) 873-8017; Access Code: 7040261. (Mallon, Kathleen)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: Counsel are expected to read the attachments to the Case Management Order. Discovery due by 2/2/2021 Dispositive Motions due by 7/15/2021 Status Report due by 11/5/2020 Trial Brief due by 7/15/2021 Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/5/20.(Pesta, J.)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Spector for Early Settlement Conference. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/6/2020. (DeRubeis, B.)
August 3, 2020 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Compagnone, David)
July 28, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Emily Wiecek, John Wiecek.(Noah, Patrice)
July 6, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Emily Wiecek waiver sent on 6/9/2020, answer due 8/8/2020 filed by Patricia Chambrello. (Compagnone, David)
July 6, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to John Wiecek waiver sent on 6/9/2020, answer due 8/8/2020 filed by Patricia Chambrello. (Compagnone, David)
June 26, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/10/2020 (DeRubeis, B.)
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrice S Noah on behalf of Emily Wiecek, John Wiecek (Noah, Patrice)
June 9, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Emily Wiecek, John Wiecek* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *David Compagnone* *The Kaloidis Lawfirm* *580 Watertown Ave.* *Waterbury, CT 06708*. (Reis, Julia)
June 9, 2020 Filing 7 ENTERED IN ERROR: ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Patricia Chambrello* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *David Compagnone* *The Kaloidis Lawfirm* *580 Watertown Ave.* *Waterbury, CT 06708*. (Reis, Julia) Modified on 6/9/2020 (Reis, Julia).
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Patricia Chambrello, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 6/9/2020. (Reis, Julia)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/9/2020. (Reis, Julia)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/9/2020. (Reis, Julia)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/9/2020.(Reis, Julia)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/8/2020. Discovery due by 12/9/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 1/13/2021. Signed by Clerk on 6/9/2020. (Reis, Julia)
June 9, 2020 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Oliver, T.)
June 9, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Compagnone, David)
June 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number BCTDC-5904986.), filed by Patricia Chambrello.(Compagnone, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chambrello v. Wiecek et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Wiecek
Represented By: Patrice S Noah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Wiecek
Represented By: Patrice S Noah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Chambrello
Represented By: David Compagnone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?