Morris et al v. Ford Motor Co.
Plaintiff: K. Benjamin, Admin Est. of Eric Morris Morris, III, Kizzy Benjamin and Eric Morris
Defendant: Ford Motor Co.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00799
Filed: June 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Ford Motor Co. to 8/13/2020. (Fazekas, J.)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time until August 13, 2020 for Defendant to file a responsive pleading. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/14/2020. (Conde, Djenab)
July 13, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time until August 13, 2020 File A Responsive Pleading #1 Complaint by Ford Motor Co.. (Schaffer, Michelle)
July 13, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Co.. (Schaffer, Michelle)
July 13, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Curtis A Berglund on behalf of Ford Motor Co. (Berglund, Curtis)
July 13, 2020 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/27/2020. (Perez, J.)
July 13, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Campbell on behalf of Ford Motor Co. (Campbell, James)
July 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle I. Schaffer on behalf of Ford Motor Co. (Schaffer, Michelle)
June 24, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eric Morris. (Berke, Robert)
June 24, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kizzy Benjamin. All Defendants. (Berke, Robert)
June 10, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Ford Motor Co.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Robert M. Berke* *Law Office of Robert M. Berke* *640 Clinton Avenue* *Bridgeport, CT 06605*. (Fazekas, J.)
June 10, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Kizzy Benjamin, Eric Morris, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Standing Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 06/9/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
June 10, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Ford Motor Co.. (Berke, Robert)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 06/9/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 06/9/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/8/2020. Discovery due by 12/9/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 1/13/2021. Signed by Clerk on 06/9/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
June 9, 2020 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
June 9, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Ford Motor Co.. (Berke, Robert)
June 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Co. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5906955.), filed by Eric Morris, Kizzy Benjamin.(Berke, Robert) Modified on 6/10/2020 to modify parties(Walker, J.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris et al v. Ford Motor Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. Benjamin, Admin Est. of Eric Morris Morris, III
Represented By: Robert M. Berke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kizzy Benjamin
Represented By: Robert M. Berke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Morris
Represented By: Robert M. Berke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Co.
Represented By: Michelle I. Schaffer
Represented By: James M. Campbell
Represented By: Curtis A Berglund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?