Harnage v. Hannah et al
Plaintiff: James A. Harnage
Defendant: Omprekash Pillai, Gerald Valleta, Cheryl Spano-Lonis, Adrianna DeBarros, Robert Bennetti, Erin Doyle, Tawanna Furtick, David Giles, Janine Brennan, Syed Johar Naqvi, Lisa Candelario, Cynthia L'Hereaux, Cynthia Nadeau, Amondah Hannah, Heidi Greene and Jane Doe
Case Number: 3:2020cv00805
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alvin W Thompson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion For Injunction (ECF No. #21 ) is hereby GRANTED, over objection, to August 14, 2020. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 8/7/2020. (Brambila, N.)
August 7, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by the Attorney General for the official capacities of the following dfts: by Cheryl Spano-Lonis, Omprekash Pillai, Jane Doe, Robert Bonnetti, Janine Brennan, David Giles, Gerald Valletta, Heidi Greene, Erin Doyle, Lisa Candelario, Cynthia L'Hereaux, Syed Johar Naqvi, Cynthia Nadeau, Tawanna Furtick, Adrianna DeBarros. Cheryl Spano-Lonis served on 7/30/2020, answer due 8/19/2020; Omprekash Pillai served on 7/30/2020, answer due 8/19/2020; Jane Doe served on 7/30/2020, answer due 8/19/2020; Robert Bonnetti served on 7/30/2020, answer due 8/19/2020; Janine Brennan served on 7/30/2020, answer due 8/19/2020; David Giles served on 7/30/2020, answer due 8/19/2020; Gerald Valletta served on 7/30/2020, answer due 8/19/2020; Heidi Greene served on 7/30/2020, answer due 8/19/2020; Erin Doyle served on 7/30/2020, answer due 8/19/2020; Lisa Candelario served on 7/30/2020, answer due 8/19/2020; Cynthia L'Hereaux served on 7/30/2020, answer due 8/19/2020; Syed Johar Naqvi served on 7/30/2020, answer due 8/19/2020; Cynthia Nadeau served on 7/30/2020, answer due 8/19/2020; Tawanna Furtick served on 7/30/2020, answer due 8/19/2020; Adrianna DeBarros served on 7/30/2020, answer due 8/19/2020. (Pesta, J.)
August 6, 2020 Filing 21 First MOTION for Extension of Time until August 14th, 2020 to Respond to Motion for Injunction (Doc. 4), see also (Doc. 11) #11 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,, #4 EXPARTE MOTION by Gerald Valletta. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Finucane, Stephen)
August 3, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE re #19 Notice (Other) filed by Gerald Valletta. (Finucane, Stephen)
August 3, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE re: Diagnostic Imaging Testing by James A. Harnage. (Agati, Kathryn)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 7/28/2020. (Ferguson, L.)
July 28, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen R. Finucane on behalf of Robert Bonnetti, Gerald Valletta (individual and official capacity appearance) (Finucane, Stephen)
July 28, 2020 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Dr. Gerald Valletta, Dr. Syed Naqvi, Nurse Cynthia Nadeau, CHNS Adriana DeBarros, David Giles, Dr. Omprakash Pillai, Heidi Greene, Supervising Nurse Tawanna Furtick, Cheryl Spano-Lonis, LPN Robert Bonetti, LPN Lisa Candelario, Cynthia LHeureaux, and Nurse Janine Brennan on 7/28/2020. Waiver of Service due by 9/1/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: As per the attached order, the plaintiff's Motion for the Appointment of Counsel (ECF No. #14 ) is hereby DENIED. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 7/16/2020. (Brambila, N.)
July 15, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Order Commanding Defendants to File MRI/CAT Scan Images and Report Under Seal In Aid of Pending Temporary Injunction by James A. Harnage. (Agati, Kathryn)
July 15, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by James A. Harnage. (Agati, Kathryn)
July 9, 2020 USM 285 forms together with Summons, Complaint, Order granting IFP reviewed and sent to USM for service on defendants Valletta, Naqvi, Nadeau, DeBarros, Giles, Pillai, Greene, Furtick, Spano-Lonis, Doyle, Bonnetti, Candelario, LHereaux, and Brennan. Marshals Return of Service on Summons due by 7/29/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
July 9, 2020 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Robert Bonnetti, Janine Brennan, Lisa Candelario, Adrianna DeBarros, Erin Doyle, Tawanna Furtick, David Giles, Heidi Greene, Cynthia L'Hereaux, Cynthia Nadeau, Syed Johar Naqvi, Omprekash Pillai, Cheryl Spano-Lonis, Gerald Valletta* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *James A. Harnage #149472* *GARNER CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION* *50 Nunnawauk Rd, P.O. Box 5500* *Newtown, CT 06470*. (Agati, Kathryn)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Standing Order re: Initial Discovery Disclosures. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/9/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Notice of Deadlines re INITIAL REVIEW ORDER (ECF No. #11 ). Discovery due by 2/6/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 3/8/2021. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 7/8/2020.(Ferguson, L.)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER: As per the attached order, the plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis is hereby GRANTED. The plaintiff's claims against defendant Hannah are hereby DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b)(1). The deliberate indifference claims will proceed against the remaining defendants. The defendants are directed to file a response to the plaintiff's motion for temporary restraining order within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 7/8/2020. (Brambila, N.)
June 16, 2020 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alvin W. Thompson: A telephonic status conference was held today. Attorney Finucane appeared on behalf of the Warden of the Garner Correctional Institution and Mr. Harnage appeared pro se. The Plaintiff's Emergency Application for Ex Parte Temporary Injunction (ECF No. 4) is no longer ex parte and will remain pending until after the court has ruled on the plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis and an Initial Review Order has been issued. Total Time: 15 Minutes (Court Reporter Corinna Thompson.) (Brambila, N.)
June 12, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/16/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin W. Thompson. Dial-in instructions have been emailed to counsel. (Brambila, N.)
June 11, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen R. Finucane on behalf of Amondah Hannah Official-Capacity Appearance Only (Finucane, Stephen)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER ON PRISONER ELECTRONIC FILING PROGRAM Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 06/10/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 06/10/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 06/10/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
June 10, 2020 Filing 4 PRISCS - Emergency EXPARTE MOTION for Temporary Injunction by James A. Harnage. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Fazekas, J.) Modified on 6/10/2020 to add prefix (Fazekas, J.).
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 PRISCS - Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by James A. Harnage. (Fazekas, J.)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 PRISCS - MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James A. Harnage. (Fazekas, J.)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 PRISCS - COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by James A. Harnage.(Fazekas, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harnage v. Hannah et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omprekash Pillai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Valleta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Spano-Lonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrianna DeBarros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bennetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Doyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tawanna Furtick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janine Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syed Johar Naqvi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Candelario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia L'Hereaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Nadeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amondah Hannah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A. Harnage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?