Danoff v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Linda Danoff
Defendant: Ethicon Inc and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 3:2020cv00816
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Filing 83 NOTICE by Linda Danoff Plaintiff Fact Sheet (Pasquarello, Philip)
August 7, 2020 Filing 82 NOTICE by Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson re 79 Order, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Simpson, Robert)
August 6, 2020 Filing 81 NOTICE by Linda Danoff Plaintiff Fact Sheet (Pasquarello, Philip)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 NOTICE: Plaintiff should docket a copy of the "Plaintiff Fact Sheet" by Monday, August 10 at 12:00 pm. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/6/2020. (DeRubeis, B.)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER: Defendants are ordered to file on the docket a one-page Notice that lists (with pin cites) cases concerning the issue it seeks to raise concerning the Connecticut Product Liability Statute. The court expects defendant to list all cases, both those supporting its position and opposing. No argument is requested. Defendants shall file this Notice within three days of the docketing of this Order. SO ORDERED by Janet C. Hall on 8/4/2020.(Angulo, Patrick)
August 4, 2020 Filing 78 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janet C. Hall: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 8/4/2020. Scheduling Order to issue. 40 minutes(Court Reporter Terri Fidanza.) (Lewis, D)
July 28, 2020 Filing 77 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/4/2020 09:30 AM in Chambers Room 107, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Janet C. Hall. Counsel are requested to participate in this conference, via telephone. Please use the following dial-in for this call: 1-877-873-8017; Access Code: 6415663#. (DeRubeis, B.)
July 27, 2020 Filing 76 Consent STIPULATION PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER RESOLVING DEFENDANTS' 10.12.2018 MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE - THIS DOCUMENT RELATES TO DKT. #25 by Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (Simpson, Robert)
July 27, 2020 Filing 75 PROPOSED ORDER JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson. (Simpson, Robert)
July 16, 2020 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip Pasquarello on behalf of Linda Danoff (Pasquarello, Philip)
July 16, 2020 Filing 73 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #63 MOTION for Attorney(s) PHILIP M. PASQUARELLO to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5974643) by Linda Danoff. (Pasquarello, Philip)
July 16, 2020 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee Balefsky on behalf of Linda Danoff (Balefsky, Lee)
July 16, 2020 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher A Gomez on behalf of Linda Danoff (Gomez, Christopher)
July 16, 2020 Filing 70 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #65 MOTION for Attorney(s) Christopher A. Gomez to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5974981) by Linda Danoff. (Gomez, Christopher)
July 16, 2020 Filing 69 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #64 MOTION for Attorney(s) LEE BALEFSKY to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5974967) by Linda Danoff. (Balefsky, Lee)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #65 MOTION for Attorney Christopher A. Gomez to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 9/14/2020. Signed by Clerk on 7/16/2020. (Reis, Julia)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #64 MOTION for Attorney LEE BALEFSKY to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 9/14/2020. Signed by Clerk on 7/16/2020. (Reis, Julia)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting #63 MOTION for Attorney PHILIP M. PASQUARELLO to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 9/14/2020. Signed by Clerk on 7/16/2020. (Reis, Julia)
July 15, 2020 Filing 65 MOTION for Attorney(s) Christopher A. Gomez to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5974981) by Linda Danoff. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of CHRISTOPHER A. GOMEZ)(Bernard, David)
July 15, 2020 Filing 64 MOTION for Attorney(s) LEE BALEFSKY to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5974967) by Linda Danoff. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of LEE BALEFSKY)(Bernard, David)
July 15, 2020 Filing 63 MOTION for Attorney(s) PHILIP M. PASQUARELLO to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5974643) by Linda Danoff. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip M. Pasquarello)(Bernard, David)
July 15, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Bernard on behalf of Linda Danoff (Bernard, David)
June 16, 2020 Filing 61 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Ethicon Inc. (Simpson, Robert)
June 15, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren R. Greenspoon on behalf of Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson (Greenspoon, Lauren)
June 15, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Reginald Simpson on behalf of Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson (Simpson, Robert)
June 12, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE TO COUNSEL IN TRANSFERRED CASE. Signed by Clerk on 6/12/2020.(Reis, Julia)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/12/2020. (Reis, Julia)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/12/2020. (Reis, Julia)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/12/2020. (Reis, Julia)
June 12, 2020 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Walker, J.)
June 12, 2020 Filing 54 Case electronically transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:15-cv-13660.
June 8, 2020 Filing 53 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #41 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1986) Pls Amended Mot to Exclude Thomas Wright, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1988) Pls Amended Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Thomas Wright, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2143) Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Thomas Wright, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3844) Pls Reply to Notice of Adoption of Resp of Thomas Wright, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (6864) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Thomas Wright, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (6973) Notice of Adoption of Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Thomas Wright, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (7119) Notice of Adoption of Pls Reply of Thomas Wright)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/9/2020 to add party filer) (msa).
June 8, 2020 Filing 52 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #41 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (3617) - Pls Mot to Exclude John Wagner, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3618) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude John Wagner, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3851) Pls Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude John Wagner, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (4920) Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude John Wagner, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (6861) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot of John Wagner, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (6991) Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp Regarding John Wagner, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (7144) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Reply of John Wagner)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/9/2020 to add party filer) (msa).
June 8, 2020 Filing 51 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #41 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2060) - Pls Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2065) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2134) Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2232) Pls Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2910) Defs Supp Resp and Notice of Adoption of Resp Regarding Timothy Ulatowski, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (6860) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot of Timothy Ulatowski, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (6965) Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp Regarding Timothy Ulatowski, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (7143) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Reply of Timothy Ulatowski)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/9/2020 to add party filer) (msa).
June 8, 2020 Filing 50 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #41 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2658) Pls Mot to Exclude Ted Roth, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3668) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Ted Roth, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3755) Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Ted Roth, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3857) Pls Reply to Notice of Adoption of Resp of Ted Roth, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (6845) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Ted Roth, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (7039) Notice of Adoption of Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Ted Roth, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (7108) Notice of Adoption of Pls Reply of Ted Roth)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/9/2020 to add party filer) (msa).
June 8, 2020 Filing 49 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #41 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2205) Part 1 Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2205) Part 2 Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2205) Part 3 Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2206) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2287) Part 1 Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2287) Part 2 Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2297) Pls Reply to Notice of Adoption of Resp of Stven Maclean, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 1 Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 2 Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2552) Part 3 Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2825) Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2826) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2942) Defs Resp to Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (3053) Pls Reply to Notice of Adoption of Resp of Steven Maclean, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (6824) Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (6998) Notice of Adoption of Defs Resp to Mot to Exclude Steven Maclean, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (7100) Notice of Adoption of Pls Reply of Steven Maclean)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/9/2020 to add party filer) (msa).
June 8, 2020 Filing 48 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #41 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (5482) - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (5548) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (6852) - Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (6960) Notice of Adoption of Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/9/2020 to add party filer) (msa).
June 8, 2020 Filing 47 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #41 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2047) Part 1 - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 2 - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 3 - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 4 - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 5 - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 6 - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 7 - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 8 - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 9 - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 10 - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 11 - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 12 - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 13 - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2047) Part 14 - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2049) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 1 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 2 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (2163) Part 3 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (2241) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (2817) - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (2818) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (2931) - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #23 Exhibit MDL ECF (3024) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #24 Exhibit MDL ECF (5332) - Def's Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig, #25 Exhibit MDL ECF (5333) - Def's Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Bruce Rosenzweig)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/9/2020 to add party filer) (msa).
June 8, 2020 Filing 46 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #41 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2079) - Def's Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2080) - Def's Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2148) - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2229) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (3019) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (3592) - Def's Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3594) - Def's Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3788) - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3845) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (6786) Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (6930) Notice of Adoption of Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Suzanne Parisian)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/9/2020 to add party filer) (msa).
June 8, 2020 Filing 45 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #41 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2200) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3626) Part 1 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3626) Part 2 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3630) - Def's Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 1 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 2 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 3 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 4 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 5 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (3767) Part 6 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (3855) - Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (6648) Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (6833) Amended Notice of Adoption of Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (6926) Notice of Adoption of Pls Resp Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (7123) Notice of Adoption of Defs Reply of Uwe Klinge)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/9/2020 to add party filer) (msa).
June 8, 2020 Filing 44 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #41 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1978) Part 1 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 2 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 3 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 4 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 5 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 6 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 7 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 8 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 9 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 10 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 11 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 12 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 13 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 14 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 15 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 16 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 17 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 18 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 19 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 20 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (1978) Part 21 - Def's Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (1982) - Def's Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #23 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 1 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #24 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 2 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #25 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 3 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge, #26 Exhibit MDL ECF (2188) Part 4 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Uwe Klinge)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/9/2020 to add party filer) (msa).
June 8, 2020 Filing 43 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #41 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (3621) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 1 Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 2 Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (3790) Part 3 Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (3865) Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (6874) Part 1 Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (6874) Part 2 Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (6874) Part 3 Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (6875) Defs Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (7038) Notice of Adoption of Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (7045) Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (7085) Amended Notice of Adoption of Pls Mot to Vladimir Iakovlev, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (7183) Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/9/2020 to add party filer) (msa).
June 8, 2020 Filing 42 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #41 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2066) Part 1 - Def's Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 2 - Def's Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 3 - Def's Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 4 - Def's Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 5 - Def's Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2066) Part 6 - Def's Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2070) - Def's Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Valimir Iakovlev, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 1 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 2 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 3 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 4 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 5 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 6 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 7 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 8 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 9 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 10 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 11 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 12 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 13 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #21 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 14 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #22 Exhibit MDL ECF (2185) Part 15 - Pls Resp to Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #23 Exhibit MDL ECF (2251) Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #24 Exhibit MDL ECF (3619) Part 1 Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev, #25 Exhibit MDL ECF (3619) Part 2 Defs Mot to Exclude Vladimir Iakovlev)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/9/2020 to add party filer) (msa).
June 8, 2020 Filing 41 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (238) First Amended Master Long Form Complaint, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (239) Master Answer of Ethicon, Inc. to First Amended Master Complaint, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (241) Master Answer of Johnson & Johnson to First Amended Master Complaint, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (262) - Short Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (263) Amended Short Form Complaint)(Gage, William) (Modified on 6/9/2020 to add party filer) (msa).
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 6/12/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 6/11/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/29/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (maw)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER denying #21 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Strike and Supporting Memorandum re: #20 Response In Opposition. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/29/2020. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (st)
April 24, 2019 Filing 38 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1 - List of Cases, #2 Exhibit Exh 2 - Letter)(Gage, William)
April 23, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Linda Danoff (Balefsky, Lee)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 SHOW CAUSE ORDER directing that plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants named in cases on Exhibit 1 are directed to show cause in writing why they should not be sanctioned for failing to comply with the Order entered in MDL 2327 at ECF #7710 by Wednesday 4/24/2019; any filing must be made in the individual cases on Exhibit 1; the court will schedule a hearing at a later date. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/10/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit 1) (mwk) (ADI)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER The court ORDERS that by 4/8/2019 plaintiffs' leadership and counsel for ALL defendants with cases identified on Exhibit A attached hereto are directed to go to the court's website at https://www.wvsd.uscourts.gov/MDL/ethicon/forms.html, complete and jointly submit one copy of the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet in Excel format as found on the court's website to the court at WVSDml_MDL_Transfers@wvsd.uscourts.gov; the parties shall use the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet on the court's website, as it is already partially completed; if the court's docket sheet for any case on Exhibit A indicates that the case has closed prior to or after the entry of this order, the parties are directed to so indicate on the Transfer/Remand Information Spreadsheet and need not complete the requested information on the Spreadsheet; the court cautions that many of these cases name other MDL defendants in addition to the Ethicon defendants; the court expects any necessary coordination from all defendants remaining in the cases on Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/26/2019. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (sak) (ADI)
January 25, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Julia M. Rafferty on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Rafferty, Julia)
January 3, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by John J. O'Donnell updating name and/or firm information on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (O'Donnell, John)
January 3, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY INFORMATION by Joseph E. O'Neil updating name and/or firm information on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (O'Neil, Joseph)
December 20, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE OF REQUEST TO BE REMOVED FROM THE COURT'S SERVICE LIST by Julianne E. Jayson on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jayson, Julianne)
December 20, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL by Julianne E. Jayson for Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Jayson, Julianne)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca) (ADI)
October 25, 2018 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM by Linda Danoff in opposition to #25 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Balefsky, Lee)
October 25, 2018 Filing 27 RESPONSE by Linda Danoff in opposition to #25 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Balefsky, Lee)
October 12, 2018 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #25 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Gage, William)
October 12, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Partial Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Gage, William) (Modified on 10/16/2018 to convert to a motion for partial summary judgment)(rmc)
October 3, 2018 Filing 24 STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT OF THE PARTIES REGARDING DEPOSITIONS OF PLAINTIFF'S FRIENDS AND FAMILY MEMBERS by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Linda Danoff (Jayson, Julianne) (Modified on 10/4/2018 to add party filer)(rmc).
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying #18 MOTION AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss for Failure to Comply with PTO 303 or Alternatively to Showcause for Failure to Comply with PTO 303 and Request for Expedited Briefing. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/16/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (st)
August 15, 2018 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Defendants Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William)
August 14, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Strike and Supporting Memorandum re: #20 Response In Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Gage, William)
August 13, 2018 Filing 20 RESPONSE by Linda Danoff in opposition to #18 MOTION AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss for Failure to Comply with PTO 303 or Alternatively to Showcause for Failure to Comply with PTO 303 and Request for Expedited Briefing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Balefsky, Lee)
August 10, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Failure to File Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Comply with PTO 303 or Alternatively for Plaintiffs to Show Cause for Failure to Comply with PTO 303 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, B & C)(Gage, William)
July 24, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss for Failure to Comply with PTO 303 or Alternatively to Showcause for Failure to Comply with PTO 303 and Request for Expedited Briefing (Gage, William)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER The #15 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss for Failure to Comply With PTO 280 or Alternatively for Plaintiffs to Show Cause for Failure to Comply With PTO 280 or for Alternative Relief, Request for Expedited Briefing is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/14/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: Cases Listed on Appendix A & B) (kab)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PRETRIAL ORDER # 303 (Amended Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 280. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 8 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases) (brn) (ADI)
June 13, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Dismiss for Failure to Comply With PTO 280 or Alternatively for Plaintiffs to Show Cause for Failure to Comply With PTO 280 or for Alternative Relief, Request for Expedited Briefing and Supporting Memorandum (Gage, William)
May 24, 2018 Filing 14 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production to Plaintiff. (O'Neil, Joseph)
May 18, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Ethicon, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production to Plaintiff. (O'Neil, Joseph)
April 5, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Julianne E. Jayson on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jayson, Julianne)
April 2, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPE DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Linda Danoff on 4/9/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (O'Donnell, John)
March 27, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of #6 Notice of Videotaped Deposition (Gage, William)
March 26, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by John J. O'Donnell on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (O'Donnell, John)
March 23, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Joseph E. O'Neil on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (O'Neil, Joseph)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRETRIAL ORDER # 280 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING ETHICON, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 8 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. For any cases in the Ethicon, Inc. MDL with a Covidien Wave 1 flag, the stay on the flagged Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases in the Ethicon MDL are incorporated in the Ethicon, Inc., Wave 8 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 8 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 8 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (ts) (ADI)
January 30, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Raul Mendelovici on 4/5/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Gage, William)
June 8, 2017 Filing 5 PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Linda Danoff. (Gomez, Christopher)
November 11, 2015 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy)
November 5, 2015 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David)
October 6, 2015 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 195 (First Amended Docket Control Order - Wave 1 Cases) entered on 09/03/2015 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit A) (kp)
October 5, 2015 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-4152301. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (kp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Danoff v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Danoff
Represented By: Christopher A Gomez
Represented By: Philip Pasquarello
Represented By: Lee Balefsky
Represented By: David M. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Inc
Represented By: Robert Reginald Simpson
Represented By: Lauren R. Greenspoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Robert Reginald Simpson
Represented By: Lauren R. Greenspoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?