Bernardi et al v. American Medical Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: Joseph Bernardi and Ann Bernardi
Defendant: American Medical Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00833
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey A Meyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Heather A. Ritch Rocks to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6025943) by American Medical Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 NJ Cert Good Standing, #2 PA Cert Good Standing, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of Heather A. Ritch Rocks)(O'Dea, Thomas)
August 11, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jennifer A. Lenze to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6025770) by Ann Bernardi, Joseph Bernardi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Newman, Bruce)
July 13, 2020 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/27/2020. (Gutierrez, Y.)
July 13, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Medical Systems, Inc.. (O'Dea, Thomas)
July 13, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by American Medical Systems, Inc..(O'Dea, Thomas)
July 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P. O'Dea, Jr on behalf of American Medical Systems, Inc. (O'Dea, Thomas)
July 2, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ann Bernardi, Joseph Bernardi. American Medical Systems, Inc. served on 6/22/2020, answer due 7/13/2020. (Newman, Bruce)
June 19, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *American Medical Systems, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Bruce E. Newman* *Brown, Paindiris & Scott, LLP* *747 Stafford Avenue* *Bristol, CT 06010*. (Freberg, B)
June 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Ann Bernardi, Joseph Bernardi, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 6/19/2020.(Freberg, B)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 6/17/2020.(Freberg, B)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 6/17/2020.(Freberg, B)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/16/2020; Discovery due by 12/17/2020; Dispositive Motions due by 1/21/2021. Signed by Clerk on 6/17/2020.(Freberg, B)
June 17, 2020 Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer added. (Oliver, T.)
June 17, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to American Medical Systems, Inc.. (Newman, Bruce)
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American Medical Systems, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5922019.), filed by Ann Bernardi, Joseph Bernardi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Newman, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bernardi et al v. American Medical Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Bernardi
Represented By: Bruce E. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Bernardi
Represented By: Bruce E. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Medical Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas P. O'Dea, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?