Sheppard v. Roberts et al
Plaintiff: Lawrence Sheppard
Defendant: Papoosha, Cook, Martin, Randolph, Roberts, Santiago and Eberle
Case Number: 3:2020cv00875
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cook, Eberle, Martin, Papoosha, Randolph, Roberts, Santiago, filed by Lawrence Sheppard. (Attachments: #1 Envelope and Letter)(Fazekas, J.)
July 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address by Lawrence Sheppard (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Payton, R.)
July 16, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Lawrence Sheppard. (Fazekas, J.)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. For the reasons stated in the attached Order, Mr. Sheppard is directed to file a complete Complaint by August 7, 2020. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/16/2020. (Garcia, A.)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If you change your address at any time during the litigation of this case, Local Rule 83.1(2) provides that you notify the court. Failure to do so can result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 7/2/20. (Payton, R.)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER ON PRISONER ELECTRONIC FILING PROGRAM Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 06/24/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 06/24/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 06/24/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
June 24, 2020 Filing 3 PRISCS - Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Lawrence Sheppard. (Fazekas, J.)
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 PRISCS - MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lawrence Sheppard. (Fazekas, J.)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 PRISCS - COMPLAINT against Cook, Eberle, Martin, Papoosha, Randolph, Roberts, Santiago, filed by Lawrence Sheppard.(Fazekas, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheppard v. Roberts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Papoosha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eberle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?