Mack v. Carousel Preschool, LLC
Plaintiff: Jessica Mack
Defendant: Carousel Preschool, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00877
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2612
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Carousel Preschool, LLC.(Cassot, Robert)
August 19, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Lauren A. MacDonald to Withdraw as Attorney by Carousel Preschool, LLC. (MacDonald, Lauren)
August 13, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Ashley MacDonald on behalf of Carousel Preschool, LLC (MacDonald, Lauren)
August 12, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Carousel Preschool, LLC to 8/21/2020. (Johnson, D.)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Defendant's #9 consent motion for extension is hereby GRANTED. Defendant shall file its response to the complaint no later than August 21, 2020.Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 8/12/2020. (Super, John)
August 7, 2020 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 8-21-20 TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT #1 Complaint, #7 Electronic Summons Issued, #8 Summons Returned Executed by Carousel Preschool, LLC. (Cassot, Robert)
July 21, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jessica Mack. Carousel Preschool, LLC served on 7/19/2020, answer due 8/9/2020. (Paradisi, Matthew)
June 25, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Carousel Preschool, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Matthew D. Paradisi* *Cicchiello & Cicchiello, LLP* *364 Franklin Avenue* *Hartford, CT 06114*. (Peterson, M)
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Jessica Mack, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Protective Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Jessica Mack Signed by Clerk on 06/25/2020. (Peterson, M)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 06/25/2020. (Peterson, M)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 06/25/2020. (Peterson, M)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/24/2020. Discovery due by 12/25/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 1/29/2021. Signed by Clerk on 06/25/2020. (Peterson, M)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Emanuele Robert Cicchiello on behalf of Jessica Mack (Cicchiello, Emanuele)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carousel Preschool, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5936500.), filed by Jessica Mack.(Paradisi, Matthew)
June 25, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Carousel Preschool, LLC. (Paradisi, Matthew)
June 25, 2020 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mack v. Carousel Preschool, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Mack
Represented By: Matthew D. Paradisi
Represented By: Emanuele Robert Cicchiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carousel Preschool, LLC
Represented By: Lauren Ashley MacDonald
Represented By: Robert W. Cassot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?