Zurich American Insurance Company v. Mascia
Plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Company
Defendant: Kristy E. Mascia, Lisa Nichols and Classic Tuxedo, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00878
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa A. Scozzafava on behalf of Classic Tuxedo, Inc. (Scozzafava, Melissa)
August 6, 2020 Set Deadline: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/22/2020. See 19 Order. (Bozek, M.)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #17 motion for extension of time to file a planning meeting report pursuant to rule 26f, to and including September 22, 2020. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 08/06/20. (Covello, Alfred)
August 3, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zurich American Insurance Company. Lisa Nichols served on 7/29/2020, answer due 8/19/2020. (Blackburn, Stuart)
August 3, 2020 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for Parties Planning Report under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26F by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Blackburn, Stuart)
July 23, 2020 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Classic Tuxedo, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Stuart G. Blackburn* *Two Concorde Way,Bldg 3C, PO Box 608* *Windsor Locks, CT 06096*. (Bozek, M.)
July 23, 2020 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Lisa Nichols* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Stuart G. Blackburn* *Two Concorde Way,Bldg 3C, PO Box 608* *Windsor Locks, CT 06096*. (Bozek, M.)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER vacating scheduling order (13). The court will enter a scheduling order after the parties file their planning meeting report pursuant to federal rule 26f. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 07/22/20.(Codeanne, K.)
July 21, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Kristy E. Mascia to 8/27/2020. See 12 Order. (Bozek, M.)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 VACATED - SCHEDULING ORDER: discovery due by 12/31/2020; dispositive motions due by 2/28/2021; trial brief due by 4/15/2021; trial ready date 5/15/2021. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 07/21/20. (Codeanne, K.) Modified on 7/23/2020 to mark as vacated. See 14 Order (Bozek, M.).
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint to and including 08/27/2020. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 07/21/20. (Codeanne, K.)
July 21, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kristy E. Mascia, filed by Zurich American Insurance Company.(Blackburn, Stuart)
July 21, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zurich American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Zurich Holding Company of America, Inc. for Zurich American Insurance Company. (Blackburn, Stuart)
July 21, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Lisa Nichols. (Blackburn, Stuart)
July 21, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Classic Tuxedo, Inc., trading as Classic Photographers. (Blackburn, Stuart)
July 17, 2020 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until August 27, 2020 to answer, move, or otherwise plead responsively to #1 Complaint by Kristy E. Mascia. (Natale, Anthony)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela M Vickery on behalf of Kristy E. Mascia (Vickery, Angela)
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J. Natale on behalf of Kristy E. Mascia (Natale, Anthony)
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zurich American Insurance Company. Kristy E. Mascia served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Blackburn, Stuart)
June 26, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Kristy E. Mascia* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Stuart G. Blackburn* *Two Concorde Way,Bldg 3C, PO Box 608* *Windsor Locks, CT 06096*. (Bozek, M.)
June 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Zurich American Insurance Company, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, and #3 Electronic Filing Order. Signed by Clerk on 6/26/2020.(Bozek, M.)
June 26, 2020 Docket Entry Correction re #3 Electronic Filing Order. Docket text modified to correct judge. (Bozek, M.)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 6/25/2020.(Bozek, M.) Modified on 6/26/2020 to correct judge (Bozek, M.).
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/24/2020. Discovery due by 12/25/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 1/29/2021. Signed by Clerk on 6/25/2020.(Bozek, M.)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kristy E. Mascia ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5936674.), filed by Zurich American Insurance Company.(Blackburn, Stuart) Modified on 6/25/2020 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
June 25, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Kristy E. Mascia. (Blackburn, Stuart)
June 25, 2020 Judge Alfred V. Covello added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zurich American Insurance Company v. Mascia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Stuart G. Blackburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristy E. Mascia
Represented By: Angela M Vickery
Represented By: Anthony J. Natale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Classic Tuxedo, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa A. Scozzafava
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?