Garthwait v. Eversource Energy Service Company et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly Garthwait and Northeast Utilities Service Company
Defendant: Eversource Energy Service Company, The Eversource Plan Administration Committee, Eversource Investment Management Committee, Does 1-20, Whose names are currently unknown and Eversource Plan Administration Committee
Case Number: 3:2020cv00902
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The plaintiff is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why the court should not dismiss this case for failure to prosecute as a result of the plaintiffs failure to move for a default entry against the defendants. Show Cause Response due by 9/3/2020 Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/20/2020.(Lewis, D)
August 11, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kimberly Garthwait. Eversource Energy Service Company served on 7/20/2020, answer due 8/10/2020; Eversource Investment Management Committee served on 7/20/2020, answer due 8/10/2020; Eversource Plan Administration Committee served on 7/20/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (Rubinow, Laurie)
July 14, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Eversource Energy Service Company, Eversource Investment Management Committee, Eversource Plan Administration Committee* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Laurie Rubinow* *Sheperd Finkelman Miller & Shah, LLP-CT* *65 Main St.* *Chester, CT 06412*. (Reis, Julia)
July 13, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Eversource Investment Management Committee. (Rubinow, Laurie)
July 13, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Eversource Plan Administration Committee. (Rubinow, Laurie)
July 13, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Eversource Energy Service Company. (Rubinow, Laurie)
July 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by Kimberly Garthwait, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 7/1/2020. (Reis, Julia)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/30/2020. (Reis, Julia)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/30/2020. (Reis, Julia)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 6/30/2020.(Reis, Julia)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/29/2020. Discovery due by 12/30/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 2/3/2021. Signed by Clerk on 6/30/2020. (Reis, Julia)
June 30, 2020 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Oliver, T.)
June 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Eversource Energy Service Company, Eversource Plan Administration Committee, Eversource Investment Management Committee, Does ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5946774.), filed by Kimberly Garthwait. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rubinow, Laurie) Modified on 7/1/2020 to correct parties (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garthwait v. Eversource Energy Service Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Garthwait
Represented By: Laurie Rubinow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northeast Utilities Service Company
Represented By: Laurie Rubinow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eversource Energy Service Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Eversource Plan Administration Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eversource Investment Management Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20, Whose names are currently unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eversource Plan Administration Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?