Giraud v. Cuevas
Plaintiff: Rasheen Giraud
Defendant: Cuevas
Case Number: 3:2020cv00906
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If you change your address at any time during the litigation of this case, Local Rule 83.1(c)2 provides that you notify the court. Failure to do so can result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 7/9/20. (Payton, R.)
July 7, 2020 Filing 10 Docket Entry Correction re #5 Standing Scheduling Order ENTERED IN ERROR (Fazekas, J.)
July 7, 2020 Filing 9 Docket Entry Correction re #4 Standing Order on Social Security Appeals ENTERED IN ERROR. (Fazekas, J.)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER ON PRISONER ELECTRONIC FILING PROGRAM Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 07/1/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 07/1/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 07/1/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENTERED IN ERROR - STANDING SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 07/1/2020.(Fazekas, J.) Modified on 7/7/2020 (Fazekas, J.).
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENTERED IN ERROR - STANDING ORDER ON SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 07/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Fazekas, J.) Modified on 7/7/2020 (Fazekas, J.).
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 PRISCS - Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Rasheen Giraud. (Fazekas, J.)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2 PRISCS - MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Rasheen Giraud. (Fazekas, J.)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 PRISCS - COMPLAINT against Cuevas, filed by Rasheen Giraud.(Fazekas, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Giraud v. Cuevas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cuevas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rasheen Giraud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?