Gibson v. Rodriguez et al
Plaintiff: William Gibson
Defendant: Cook, C.O. Moore, John Doe, Medical Dept. at Osborn C.I., Right, Rodriguez, Kennedy, Thibeault, Hinez and Moore
Case Number: 3:2020cv00953
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Referring Judge: Dominic J Squatrito
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Dominic J. Squatrito for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 9/1/2020.(Walker, J.)
August 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by William Gibson (Payton, R.)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If you change your address at anytime during the litigation of this case, Local Rule 83.1(c)2 provides that you notify the court. Failure to do so can result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge William I. Garfinkel on 7/16/20. (Payton, R.)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/9/2020.(Freberg, B)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER ON PRISONER ELECTRONIC FILING PROGRAM Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/9/2020.(Freberg, B)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/9/2020.(Freberg, B)
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by William Gibson. (Freberg, B)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by William Gibson. (Freberg, B)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 PRISCS - COMPLAINT against Cook, John Doe, Hinez, Kennedy, Medical Dept. at Osborn C.I., Moore, Right, Rodriguez, Thibeault, filed by William Gibson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson v. Rodriguez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Dept. at Osborn C.I.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Right
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thibeault
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?