Gomes v. Pitney Bowes, Inc.
Plaintiff: Xavier Gomes
Defendant: Pitney Bowes, Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv00978
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2612
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Oliver, T.)
September 1, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal - Joint by Pitney Bowes, Inc. (Zaken, Marc)
August 27, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Pitney Bowes, Inc to 9/9/2020. (Jaiman, R.)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 motion for extension of time. The Defendant's responsive pleading is due by September 9, 2020. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 08/27/2020. (Rosenberg, J.)
August 10, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 9, 2020 Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Pitney Bowes, Inc. (Zaken, Marc)
August 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc L. Zaken on behalf of Pitney Bowes, Inc (Zaken, Marc)
July 15, 2020 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Pitney Bowes, Inc* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael John Reilly* *Cicchiello & Cicchiello, LLP* *364 Franklin Avenue* *Hartford, CT 06114*. (Fazekas, J.)
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Xavier Gomes, #4 Standing Protective Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 07/15/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 07/14/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 07/14/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/12/2020. Discovery due by 1/13/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 2/17/2021. Signed by Clerk on 07/14/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pitney Bowes, Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5972257.), filed by Xavier Gomes.(Reilly, Michael)
July 14, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Pitney Bowes, Inc.. (Reilly, Michael)
July 14, 2020 Judge Stefan R. Underhill added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomes v. Pitney Bowes, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xavier Gomes
Represented By: Michael John Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pitney Bowes, Inc
Represented By: Marc L. Zaken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?