Hernandez v. Park City Communities
Plaintiff: Nancy Hernandez
Defendant: Park City Communities
Case Number: 3:2020cv00984
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Park City Communities.(Leone, Michael)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Leone on behalf of Park City Communities (Leone, Michael)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Nancy Hernandez, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 07/16/2020. (Peterson, M)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 07/15/2020. (Peterson, M)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 07/15/2020. (Peterson, M)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/13/2020. Discovery due by 1/14/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 2/18/2021. Signed by Clerk on 07/15/2020. (Peterson, M)
July 15, 2020 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Park City Communities ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5974755.), filed by Nancy Hernandez.(Heller, Pamela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Park City Communities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park City Communities
Represented By: Michael A. Leone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Hernandez
Represented By: Pamela A. Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?