Brookes v. Saul
Plaintiff: Natalia Christina Brookes
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2020cv00993
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Sarah A L Merriam
Referring Judge: Michael P Shea
2 Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:0405dc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Certified administrative record deadline updated for Andrew Saul to 11/14/2020. (Johnson, D.)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. The Commissioner's (ECF No. #8 ) motion for extension of time is GRANTED. The Commissioner shall file the certified administrative record by November 14, 2020. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 9/9/2020. (Gait, Emily)
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until November 14, 2020 to file the Certified Administrative Record by Andrew Saul. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration in Support)(Fitzhugh, Nicol)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Absent consent to a Magistrate Judge, the case is reassigned to Judge Michael P. Shea for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 8/10/2020.(Anastasio, F.)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REMINDER: STANDING ORDER ON SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Anastasio, F.)
July 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicol Fitzhugh on behalf of Andrew Saul (Fitzhugh, Nicol)
July 17, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Andrew Saul to 9/15/2020. (Fazekas, J.)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 07/17/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 07/17/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER ON SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 07/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Fazekas, J.)
July 17, 2020 Judge Stefan R. Underhill and Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5979348.), filed by Natalia Christina Brookes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Grabow, Richard) Modified on 7/17/2020 to correct party (Anastasio, F.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brookes v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalia Christina Brookes
Represented By: Richard B. Grabow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Nicol Fitzhugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?