McArthur v. EBM Vintage and Civvies
Plaintiff: Alexander McArthur
Defendant: EBM Vintage and Civvies
Case Number: 3:2020cv01005
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 USM 285 forms together with Notice of Lawsuit/Request for Waiver of Service of Summons OPTD, Electronic Filing Order, Standing Protective Order, Order granting the IFP motion, Guide for Self-Represented Litigants, Consent to electronic notice by pro se litigant, Motion by pro se litigant to participate in electronic filing and all instructions mailed to IFP plaintiff to complete and return to Clerk's office. (Oliver, T.)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Alexander McArthur, #1 Complaint filed by Alexander McArthur, #5 Protective Order, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Electronic Filing Order Signed by Clerk on 9/8/2020.(Oliver, T.)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. McArthur has recently filed two dozen cases that are all pending before me. In each of those cases, McArthur has made a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Although McArthur does not include all relevant information in any one motion, I glean from all those motions that McArthur has been unemployed since 2009, see Mot. for IFP, Doc. No. 2, McArthur v. Yale New Haven Hospital, et al., No. 3:20-cv-998, has little-to-no real or personal property of value, see Mot. for IFP, Doc. No. 2, McArthur v. Cargil, et al., No. 3:20-cv-967, earns his only income, $783 per month, from social security, see id., and has monthly obligations totaling at least $343, see Mot. for IFP, Doc. No. 2, McArthur v. Alexis, et al., No. 3:20-cv-1159 (notably, that total does not include monthly expenditures on food and clothing). At this stage, McArthur's allegations are sufficient to establish that he is unable to pay the ordinary filing fees required by the Court. See 28 U.S.C. s. 1915(a)(1). Accordingly, McArthur's motion to leave to proceed in forma pauperis, doc. no. #2 , is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/4/2020. (Smith, E)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/14/2020.(Freberg, B)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/14/2020.(Freberg, B)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/12/2020 Discovery due by 1/13/2021 Dispositive Motions due by 2/17/2021 Signed by Clerk on 7/14/2020.(Freberg, B)
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Alexander McArthur. (Freberg, B)
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EBM Vintage and Civvies, filed by Alexander McArthur.(Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McArthur v. EBM Vintage and Civvies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EBM Vintage and Civvies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander McArthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?