Spagnardi v. Easter et al
Petitioner: Stacy Spagnardi
Respondent: Michael Carvajal and Easter
Case Number: 3:2020cv01012
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Referring Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Michael P. Shea for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/28/2020. (Reis, Julia)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Allison Murray Near on behalf of Stacy Spagnardi (Near, Allison)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/17/20.(Payton, R.)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/17/20.(Payton, R.)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Notice to petitioner re: Insufficiency for lack of payment or Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. If insufficiency not corrected Dismissal due by 8/18/2020 Signed by Clerk on 7/17/20.(Payton, R.)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Stacy Spagnardi. (Payton, R.)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus -Motion for Compassionate Release filed by Stacy Spagnardi. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Payton, R.) Modified on 7/21/2020 (Payton, R.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spagnardi v. Easter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Carvajal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Easter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stacy Spagnardi
Represented By: Allison Murray Near
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?