Mochary v. Bergstein
Plaintiff: Matthew Mochary
Defendant: Seth Bergstein
Case Number: 3:2020cv01034
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Disclosures are to be served by October 2, 2020; Plaintiffs motions to join additional parties are to be filed by October 2, 2020; Plaintiffs motions to amend the complaint are to be filed by October 16, 2020; Defendants motions under Fed.R.Civ.P 12 are to be filed by October 23, 2020;Defendants motions to join additional parties and an answer are to be filed by November 20, 2020, or 30 days after the Courts ruling on Rule 12 motions; Plaintiffs damages analysis due by March 5, 2021; Plaintiffs designation of expert witnesses and reports due by March 5, 2021;Deposition of Plaintiffs experts completed by April 16, 2021;Defendants designation of expert witnesses and reports due by June 4, 2021;Deposition of Defendants experts completed by July 16, 2021; Discovery completed by July 30, 2021;Post-Discovery Telephonic Status Conference will be held on August 5, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. Dial: 888-808-6929, Participant Code: 9284309, Bypass prompt for Security Code;Dispositive motions are to be filed by September 3, 2021; any responses to dispositive motions to be filed by September 24, 2021; and any replies to any responses to dispositive motions to be filed by October 8, 2021;The Joint Trial Memorandum is due by February 4, 2022;The parties will be trial ready by March 7, 2022. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 9/14/2020. (Tisdale, I.)
September 11, 2020 Filing 19 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Phillipps, Zachary)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: In light of #17 the stipulation reached and entered into by the parties, the #2 Motion for a temporary restraining order is DENIED as moot. Consistent with the deadline set by the Court on July 29, 2020, the Rule 26(f) report of the parties is due by September 11, 2020. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/21/2020. (Leon, Noel)
August 20, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION by Matthew Mochary. (Frederick, Steven)
August 14, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE by Matthew Mochary re August 4 Minute Entry (Frederick, Steven)
August 4, 2020 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Victor A. Bolden: Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/4/2020. Total Time: 8 minutes. (Court Reporter S. Montini.) The parties will notify the Court by August 14, 2020, whether they have reached a resolution that would require the Court to deny as moot the #2 motion for a temporary restraining order, or have not reached a resolution, at which point the Court will schedule a hearing date for the motion for temporary restraining order. (Leon, Noel)
August 1, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for August 4, 2020, at 2:00 PM before Judge Victor A. Bolden. Dial: 888-808-6929Participant Code: 9284309If you are prompted to enter a security code, please bypass it. (Leon, Noel)
August 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Hearing. A telephonic status conference will be set for August 4, 2020. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/1/2020. (Leon, Noel)
July 31, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Hearing re initial status conference by Matthew Mochary. (Frederick, Steven)
July 29, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard K. Levine on behalf of Seth Bergstein (Levine, Howard)
July 29, 2020 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/11/2020 (Perez, J.)
July 28, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Nolin on behalf of Seth Bergstein (Nolin, Peter)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to reach out to any counsel for Defendant and try to agree to a date and time to propose for telephonic status conference. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/23/2020. (Leon, Noel)
July 23, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Seth Bergstein* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Zachary John Phillipps* *Wofsey, Rosen, Kweskin & Kuriansky* *600 Summer St.* *Stamford, CT 06901*. (Imbriani, Susan)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #6 Protective Order, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint filed by Matthew Mochary, #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Matthew Mochary, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew Mochary. Signed by Clerk on 7/22/2020.(Imbriani, Susan)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/22/2020.(Imbriani, Susan)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 7/22/2020.(Imbriani, Susan)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/20/2020; Discovery due by 1/21/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 2/25/2021. Signed by Clerk on 7/22/2020.(Imbriani, Susan)
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary John Phillipps on behalf of Matthew Mochary (Phillipps, Zachary)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Matthew Mochary. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit Matthew Mochary, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Affidavit Zachary Phillipps)(Frederick, Steven)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Seth Bergstein ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5989359.), filed by Matthew Mochary. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Frederick, Steven)
July 22, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Seth Bergstein. (Frederick, Steven)
July 22, 2020 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mochary v. Bergstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Mochary
Represented By: Steven M. Frederick
Represented By: Zachary John Phillipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seth Bergstein
Represented By: Peter M. Nolin
Represented By: Howard K. Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?