Crosby v. Aetna Resources, LLC
Plaintiff: Nicole Crosby
Defendant: Aetna Resources, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv01058
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2020 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Barry, Donna)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Stay, on consent. (Tooker, Aimee)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Order of Administrative Dismissal pending conclusion of arbitration; granting #12 Motion to Stay, on consent. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 8/28/20.(Tooker, Aimee)
August 20, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay of Proceedings by Nicole Crosby.Responses due by 9/10/2020 (Sabatini, James)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 7/28/20. (Tooker, Aimee)
July 28, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #9 Protective Order, #6 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 2, 2020 to file an answer or motion in response to the Plaintiffs complaint. filed by Aetna Resources, LLC, #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Aetna Resources, LLC, #1 Notice of Removal filed by Aetna Resources, LLC, #8 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Aetna Resources, LLC, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Aetna Resources, LLC, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Aetna Resources, LLC Signed by Clerk on 07/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
July 28, 2020 Answer deadline updated for All Defendants. (Tooker, Aimee)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 07/27/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 07/27/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/26/2020 Discovery due by 1/27/2021 Dispositive Motions due by 3/3/2021 Signed by Clerk on 07/27/2020.(Nuzzi, Tiffany) Modified on 7/28/2020 to correct file date (Nuzzi, Tiffany).
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time until September 2, 2020 to file an answer or motion in response to the Plaintiffs complaint. by Aetna Resources, LLC. (McKenna, Elizabeth)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aetna Resources, LLC. (McKenna, Elizabeth)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Aetna Resources, LLC re Statement of Pending Motions (McKenna, Elizabeth)
July 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Aetna Resources, LLC of Statement regarding removed case (McKenna, Elizabeth)
July 27, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth R. McKenna on behalf of Aetna Resources, LLC (McKenna, Elizabeth)
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Aetna Resources, LLC from Superior Court, case number HHD-CV20-6129726-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5997728, filed by Aetna Resources, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(McKenna, Elizabeth)
July 27, 2020 Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crosby v. Aetna Resources, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Resources, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth R. McKenna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Crosby
Represented By: James V. Sabatini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?