Brostrom v. DePuy Synthes Products, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Charles Brostrom
Defendant: Synthes, Inc, DePuy Synthes Products, LLC, Synthes USA Products, LLC, Synthes USA, LLC and DePuy Synthes, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01066
Filed: July 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Standing Order on Joint Trial Memorandum. See attached. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 9/14/2020. (Cahill, Leslie)
September 14, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/9/2021 at 2:00 PM before Judge Kari A. Dooley. Telephonic Conference Line: 888-278-0296; Access Code: 80-77-899. (Cahill, Leslie)
September 14, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/2/2020Discovery due by 8/2/2021Dispositive Motions due by 9/1/2021Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/9/2021 at 2:00 PM before Judge Kari A. Dooley (Cahill, Leslie)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. The Court has reviewed the parties' #13 Rule 26(f) Report. It is Approved, Adopted, and So Ordered, except that the parties' joint trial memorandum shall be filed in accordance with the procedure set forth below. Pursuant to Local Rule 16(b), the Court orders as follows: The Plaintiff shall move to amend the pleadings or move to join additional parties by November 2, 2020. The Defendants shall move to join additional parties by November 16, 2020. All discovery shall be completed by August 2, 2021. Dispositive motions, if any (see Local Rule 56(c)), shall be filed by September 1, 2021. The Court will set a date for filing a joint trial memorandum after the close of discovery. The joint trial memorandum shall comport with this Court's standing order, which will be separately docketed. A telephonic status conference is scheduled for August 9, 2021 at 2:00 P.M. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 9/14/2020. (Cahill, Leslie)
September 10, 2020 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lynch, Christopher)
August 29, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Affirmative Defenses by DePuy Synthes Products, LLC, DePuy Synthes, Inc., Synthes USA Products, LLC, Synthes USA, LLC, Synthes, Inc.(Lynch, Christopher)
July 30, 2020 Answer deadline updated for all Defendants to 9/3/2020. (Cahill, Leslie)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting on consent #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 7/30/2020. (Cahill, Leslie)
July 29, 2020 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until September 3, 2020 Plead in response to the Complaint by DePuy Synthes Products, LLC, DePuy Synthes, Inc., Synthes USA Products, LLC, Synthes USA, LLC, Synthes, Inc. (Lynch, Christopher)
July 28, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Statement of Compliance with Standing Orders in Removed Cases) filed by DePuy Synthes Products, LLC, Synthes, Inc, DePuy Synthes, Inc., Synthes USA Products, LLC, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher J. Lynch on behalf of DePuy Synthes Products, LLC, Synthes, Inc, DePuy Synthes, Inc., Synthes USA, LLC, Synthes USA Products, LLC, #5 Notice of No Pending Motions filed by DePuy Synthes Products, LLC, Synthes, Inc, DePuy Synthes, Inc., Synthes USA, LLC, Synthes USA Products, LLC, #1 Notice of Removal,, filed by DePuy Synthes Products, LLC, Synthes, Inc, DePuy Synthes, Inc., Synthes USA, LLC, Synthes USA Products, LLC, #7 Electronic Filing Order, #8 Standing Protective Order, #6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Jury Demand filed by DePuy Synthes Products, LLC, Synthes, Inc, DePuy Synthes, Inc., Synthes USA, LLC, Synthes USA Products, LLC Signed by Clerk on 07/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order)(Fazekas, J.)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 07/28/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 07/28/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 9/26/2020. Discovery due by 1/27/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 3/3/2021. Signed by Clerk on 07/28/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
July 28, 2020 Judge Kari A. Dooley added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by DePuy Synthes Products, LLC, DePuy Synthes, Inc., Synthes USA Products, LLC, Synthes USA, LLC, Synthes, Inc Statement re No Pending Motions in State Court action (Lynch, Christopher)
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by DePuy Synthes Products, LLC, DePuy Synthes, Inc., Synthes USA Products, LLC, Synthes USA, LLC, Synthes, Inc Statement of Compliance with Standing Orders in Removed Cases (Lynch, Christopher)
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by DePuy Synthes Products, LLC, DePuy Synthes, Inc., Synthes USA Products, LLC, Synthes USA, LLC, Synthes, Inc.. (Lynch, Christopher)
July 28, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Lynch on behalf of DePuy Synthes Products, LLC, DePuy Synthes, Inc., Synthes USA Products, LLC, Synthes USA, LLC, Synthes, Inc. and W. Kennedy Simpson (Lynch, Christopher)
July 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Synthes USA, LLC, DePuy Synthes, Inc., Synthes USA Products, LLC, Synthes, Inc., DePuy Synthes Products, LLC from Superior Court for the State of Connecticut Judicial District of New London at New London, case number KNL CV 20 6047381 S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-5999709, filed by Synthes USA, LLC, DePuy Synthes, Inc., Synthes USA Products, LLC, Synthes, Inc., DePuy Synthes Products, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal)(Lynch, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brostrom v. DePuy Synthes Products, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Brostrom
Represented By: Joseph M. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synthes, Inc
Represented By: W. Kennedy Simpson
Represented By: Christopher J. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Synthes Products, LLC
Represented By: W. Kennedy Simpson
Represented By: Christopher J. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synthes USA Products, LLC
Represented By: W. Kennedy Simpson
Represented By: Christopher J. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synthes USA, LLC
Represented By: W. Kennedy Simpson
Represented By: Christopher J. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DePuy Synthes, Inc.
Represented By: W. Kennedy Simpson
Represented By: Christopher J. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?