In re: Speer
Appellant: Sheri Speer
Not Classified By Court: US Trustee
Appellee: Michael Teiger, SLS Heating, LLC, Seaport Capital Partners, LLC and Clipper Realty
Interested Party: Bonnie Mangan
Case Number: 3:2020cv01095
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Filing 20 Appellee's BRIEF by Seaport Capital Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Sternberg, Jenna)
September 17, 2020 Filing 19 Appellant's BRIEF by Sheri Speer. Appellee Brief due by 10/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Reis, Julia)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #16 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Sheri Speer. Response Noted. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/10/2020.(Lewis, D)
September 8, 2020 Filing 17 Designation of the Record and Statement of Issues per Rule 8009 by Sheri Speer (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Reis, Julia)
September 8, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE TO 11 Order to Show Cause, filed by Sheri Speer. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Reis, Julia)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rules of Bankruptcy 8018(a), the appellant must serve and file her brief by 9/28/2020, and appellee's brief is due to be filed and served by 10/28/2020. Any reply filed by the appellant must be filed by 11/12/2020. No extensions of time will be granted by the court without very good cause shown, especially in light of appellant's designation being filed late. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/31/2020. (DeRubeis, B.)
August 28, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE: A record on appeal in the above-entitled matter was transmitted to the District Court by the US Bankruptcy Court on 8/28/2020 and entered on the docket on 8/28/2020 pursuant to Bankruptcy Rules. The Appellant and Appellee shall serve and file their briefs pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 8018. Appellant Brief due by 9/27/2020. Signed by Clerk on 8/28/2020. (Fanelle, N.)
August 28, 2020 Filing 13 USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.)
August 28, 2020 Filing 12 Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Fanelle, N.)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Appellant Sheri Speer is hereby Ordered to Show Cause why the appellants Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court (Doc. No. 1 ) should not be dismissed for failure to timely comply with Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8009. Ms. Speer filed her Notice of Appeal with the court on July 31, 2020. Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8009(a)(1) requires the appellant to file with the bankruptcy clerk and serve on the appellee a designation of the items to be included in the record on appeal and a statement of the issues to be presented within 14 days after the notice of appeal becomes effective or an order granting leave to appeal is entered. Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009(a)(1). As of this date, the appellant has not filed or served the required designation and statement. Therefore, she is Ordered to Show Cause by September 16, 2020, why this appeal should not be dismissed. Failure to show good cause by September 16, 2020 will result in dismissal of this appeal. (Show Cause Response due by 9/16/2020) SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/26/2020. (DeRubeis, B.)
August 10, 2020 Filing 10 USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.)
August 10, 2020 Filing 9 Bankruptcy Filing Fee Paid: Transmittal to U.S. District Court Re: Appeal Filing Fee Paid 20-1095(JCH)(RE:)1855 Notice of Appeal filed by Sheri Speer. (Fanelle, N.)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The pro se appellant is directed to review the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, in particular, those pertaining to Rule 8009. Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8009(a)(1) requires the appellant to file with the bankruptcy clerk and serve on the appellee a designation of the items to be included in the record on appeal and a statement of the issues to be presented within 14 days of the filing of the notice of appeal becomes effective or an order granting leave to appeal is entered. Failure to comply with the above Rule may result in the dismissal of this appeal. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/6/2020. (DeRubeis, B.)
August 3, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenna N. Sternberg on behalf of Seaport Capital Partners, LLC as Co-Counsel (Sternberg, Jenna)
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: A notice of appeal was transmitted by the U.S. Bankruptcy Court on 7/31/2020 and entered on the docket on 8/3/2020. The appellant and appellee shall comply with Bankruptcy Rule 8009. Within 14 days, the appellant shall file a notice with this Court either that appellant has filed with the Bankruptcy Court a designation and statement in accordance with Bankruptcy Rule 8009(a)(1)(B), or that the parties have prepared an agreed statement in accordance with Bankruptcy Rule 8009(d), and attach to the notice a copy of such filing. Failure to comply with this notice may result in the case being dismissed. Designation Notice due by: 8/17/2020. Signed by Clerk on 8/3/2020. (Fanelle, N.)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/31/2020. (Fanelle, N.)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/31/2020.(Fanelle, N.)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/31/2020. (Fanelle, N.)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number(s) 14-21007, filed by Sheri Speer. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Order) (Fanelle, N.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Speer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Sheri Speer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: US Trustee
Represented By: US Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Michael Teiger
Represented By: Patrick W. Boatman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SLS Heating, LLC
Represented By: Patrick W. Boatman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Seaport Capital Partners, LLC
Represented By: Patrick W. Boatman
Represented By: Jenna N. Sternberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Clipper Realty
Represented By: Patrick W. Boatman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Bonnie Mangan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?