Miller v. Cook et al
Plaintiff: George Miller
Defendant: Dave Myga, Jullian Russell, Anthony Corcella, Rollin Cook, Antonio Santiago, Cuzio, Allison Black, Ronald Cotta, Payne, Daniel Papoosha and Aldi
Case Number: 3:2020cv01126
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying #12 Motion to Appoint Counsel. A plaintiff in a civil case is not entitled to appointment of counsel on request and the Second Circuit repeatedly cautions against the routine appointment of counsel. See, e.g., Hendricks v. Coughlin, 114 F.3d 390, 393 (2d Cir. 1997); Cooper v. A. Sargenti Co., 877 F.2d 170, 172 (2d Cir. 1989). Insofar as volunteer lawyer time is not always readily available, a plaintiff seeking appointment of counsel must show first that he "sought counsel and has been unable to obtain it." McDonald v. Head Criminal Court Supervisor Officer, 850 F.2d 121, 123 (2d Cir. 1988). Once a plaintiff has made this showing, he must then demonstrate that his complaint passes the test of "likely merit." Cooper, 877 F.2d at 173. He must demonstrate that the claims in the complaint have a sufficient basis to justify appointing a volunteer lawyer to pursue them. Notably, "even where a claim is not frivolous, counsel is often unwarranted where the [plaintiffs] chances of success are extremely slim." Id. at 171. This Complaint is still undergoing initial review. The Court cannot therefore, at this juncture, determine that his claims have "likely merit." The Motion for Appointment of counsel is therefore denied without prejudice should the record that develops through the litigation permit reassessment of this issue. So Ordered. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 9/9/20. (Dooley, Kari)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER finding as moot #10 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. See ECF No. 8. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 9/9/20. (Dooley, Kari)
September 2, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Address by George Miller (Payton, R.)
August 28, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address by George Miller (Payton, R.)
August 10, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by George Miller. (Payton, R.)
August 10, 2020 Filing 11 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by George Miller. (Payton, R.)
August 10, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by George Miller. (Payton, R.)
August 10, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Aldi, Allison Black, Rollin Cook, Anthony Corcella, Ronald Cotta, Cuzio, Dave Myga, Daniel Papoosha, Payne, Jullian Russell, filed by George Miller.(Payton, R.)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If you change your address at any time during the litigation of this case, Local Rule 83.1(c)2 provides that you notify the court. Failure to do so can result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by US Magistrate Judge William I Garfinkel on 8/10/20. (Payton, R.)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER ON PRISONER ELECTRONIC FILING PROGRAM Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 08/6/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 08/6/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 08/6/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 PRISCS - Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by George Miller. (Fazekas, J.)
August 6, 2020 Filing 3 PRISCS - MOTION to Appoint Counsel by George Miller. (Fazekas, J.)
August 6, 2020 Filing 2 PRISCS - MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by George Miller. (Fazekas, J.)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 PRISCS - COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by George Miller.(Fazekas, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Cook et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Myga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jullian Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Corcella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rollin Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cuzio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Cotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Papoosha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aldi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?