Whitehead v. Traveler's Insurance Company Inc et al
Plaintiff: David Louis Whitehead
Defendant: John Does, Gabrielle Bailey and Traveler's Insurance Company Inc
Case Number: 3:2020cv01140
Filed: August 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #8 Motion to Stay filed by David Louis Whitehead. (Freberg, B)
September 22, 2020 Set Deadlines: Filing fee due by 10/23/2020 or Dismissal. (Perez, J.)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #8 Motion to Stay and Motion for Extension of Time. The Court will extend the time to pay the filing fee until October 23, 2020, but not for any time longer. If the filing fee is not paid by that date, the case will be dismissed without prejudice for a failure to prosecute. See D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 41(a) ("In civil actions in which no action has been taken by the parties for six (6) months or in which deadlines established by the Court under Rule 16 appear not to have been met, the Clerk shall give notice of proposed dismissal to counsel of record and pro se parties, if any. If such notice has been given and no action has been taken in the action in the meantime and no satisfactory explanation is submitted to the Court...the Clerk shall enter an order of dismissal. Any such order entered by the Clerk under this Rule may be suspended, altered, or rescinded by the Court for cause shown."); see e.g., Lopez v. Burris Logistics Co., 2013 WL 5962100, at *1 (D. Conn. Nov. 6, 2013) (applying Rule 41(a)). Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 9/21/2020. (Tisdale, I.)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 Emergency MOTION to Stay and MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay Filing Fees by David Louis Whitehead. (Freberg, B)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Pay Filing Fees.Plaintiff is directed to pay filing fees by September 25, 2020. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/13/2020. (Leon, Noel)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 08/10/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 08/10/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/9/2020. Discovery due by 2/9/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 3/16/2021. Signed by Clerk on 08/10/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Payment of filing fees by David Louis Whitehead. (Fazekas, J.)
August 10, 2020 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Gabrielle Bailey, John Does, Traveler's Insurance Company Inc, filed by David Louis Whitehead.(Fazekas, J.)
August 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gabrielle Bailey, John Does, Traveler's Insurance Company Inc, filed by David Louis Whitehead.(Fazekas, J.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/12/2020: #1 PDF Envelope) (Fazekas, J.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitehead v. Traveler's Insurance Company Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabrielle Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Traveler's Insurance Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Louis Whitehead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?