Nall v. Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Ashley Nall
Defendant: Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv01170
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Set Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/2/2020. (Velez, F.)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 motion for extension of time to file 26f report to and including 11/02/20. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 09/25/20. (Codeanne, K.)
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time until November 2, 2020 to File Rule 26(F) Report by Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Begos, Patrick)
August 26, 2020 Docket Entry Correction re #8 Waiver of Service Executed. Docket text modified to correct waiver sent on date from 8/25/2020 to 8/19/2020 and answer due date from 10/24/2020 to 10/18/2020. (Bozek, M.)
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Life, Inc., Corporate Parent Hartford Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Begos, Patrick)
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company waiver sent on 8/19/2020, answer due 10/18/2020 filed by Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Begos, Patrick) Modified on 8/26/2020 to correct waiver sent and answer dates (Bozek, M.).
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Walter Begos on behalf of Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company (Begos, Patrick)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ivana Deyrup Greco on behalf of Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company (Greco, Ivana)
August 13, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Hudson Taylor Ellis* *Eric Buchanan & Associates, PLLC* *414 McCallie Ave.* *Chattanooga, TN 37402*. (Bozek, M.)
August 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Ashley Nall, #3 Electronic Filing Order, and #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 8/13/2020.(Bozek, M.)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 8/12/2020.(Bozek, M.)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/11/2020. Discovery due by 2/11/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 3/18/2021. Signed by Clerk on 8/12/2020.(Bozek, M.)
August 12, 2020 Judge Alfred V. Covello added. (Oliver, T.)
August 12, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Ellis, Hudson)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-6028813.), filed by Ashley Nall. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover sheet)(Ellis, Hudson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nall v. Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Nall
Represented By: Hudson Taylor Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Ivana Deyrup Greco
Represented By: Patrick Walter Begos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?