Darnis et al v. Raytheon Technologies Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Michael Maurer, Christopher Doot, David Carter, Theresa MacKinnon, Geraud Darnis, David Hess, Richard Sanfrey, Roy Dion, Dino DePellegrini, Alan Machuga, Bradley Hardesty and Costas Loukellis
Defendant: John H. Walker, Carrier Global Corporation Deferred Compensation Plan, Frederic G. Reynolds, Christopher J. Kearney, Shailesh G. Jejurikar, Judith F. Marks, Virginia M. Wilson, Carrier Global Corporation, UTC Company Automatic Contribution Excess Plan, John V. Faraci, Ellen J. Kullman, Charles M. Holley, Jr., Otis Worldwide Corporation Deferred Compensation Plan, Otis Worldwide Savings Restoration Plan, Lloyd J. Austin, III, Margaret M. Preston, Margaret L. O'Sullivan, Harold McGraw, III, United Technologies Company Deferred Compensation Plan, United Technologies Corporation 2018 Long-Term Incentive Compensation Plan, Jeffrey H. Black, Carrier Global Corporation Company Automatic Contribution Excess Plan, David Gitlin, United Technologies Corporation Long-Term Incentive Plan, Carrier Global Corporation 2020 Long-Term Incentive Plan, John J. Greisch, Raytheon Technologies Corporation, Michael M. McNamara, Robert K. Ortberg, Diane M. Bryant, Michael A. Todman, Denise L. Ramos, Otis Worldwide Corporation 2020 Long-Term Incentive Plan, Kathy Hopinkah, United Technologies Corporation Savings Restoration Plan, Otis Worldwide Corporation LTIP Performance Share Unit Deferral Plan, Otis Worldwide Corporation, Marshall O. Larsen, Gregory J. Hayes, Jean-Pierre Garnier, Brian C. Rogers, Carrier Global Corporation Savings Restoration Plan, Otis Worldwide Corporation Company Automatic Contribution Excess Plan, Shelley Stewart, Jr., United Technologies Company Performance Share Unit Deferral Plan and Carrier Global Corporation LTIP Performance Share Unit Deferral Plan
Case Number: 3:2020cv01171
Filed: August 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Order Setting Deadlines for Certain Filings Concerning the Complaint Entry of Order Setting Deadlines for Certain Filings Concerning the Complaint Order by David Carter, Geraud Darnis, Dino DePellegrini, Roy Dion, Christopher Doot, Bradley Hardesty, David Hess, Costas Loukellis, Theresa MacKinnon, Alan Machuga, Michael Maurer, Richard Sanfrey. (Needham, Douglas)
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A. Izard, Jr on behalf of David Carter, Geraud Darnis, Dino DePellegrini, Roy Dion, Christopher Doot, Bradley Hardesty, David Hess, Costas Loukellis, Theresa MacKinnon, Alan Machuga, Michael Maurer, Richard Sanfrey (Plaintiffs) (Izard, Robert)
September 23, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark P. Kindall on behalf of David Carter, Geraud Darnis, Dino DePellegrini, Roy Dion, Christopher Doot, Bradley Hardesty, David Hess, Costas Loukellis, Theresa MacKinnon, Alan Machuga, Michael Maurer, Richard Sanfrey (Plaintiffs) (Kindall, Mark)
September 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Patrick Needham on behalf of David Carter, Geraud Darnis, Dino DePellegrini, Roy Dion, Christopher Doot, Bradley Hardesty, David Hess, Costas Loukellis, Theresa MacKinnon, Alan Machuga, Michael Maurer, Richard Sanfrey (Plaintiffs) (Needham, Douglas)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Lloyd J. Austin, III, Jeffrey H. Black, Diane M. Bryant, Carrier Global Corporation, Carrier Global Corporation 2020 Long-Term Incentive Plan, Carrier Global Corporation Company Automatic Contribution Excess Plan, Carrier Global Corporation Deferred Compensation Plan, Carrier Global Corporation LTIP Performance Share Unit Deferral Plan, Carrier Global Corporation Savings Restoration Plan, John V. Faraci, Jean-Pierre Garnier, David Gitlin, John J. Greisch, Gregory J. Hayes, Charles M. Holley, Jr, Kathy Hopinkah, Shailesh G. Jejurikar, Christopher J. Kearney, Ellen J. Kullman, Marshall O. Larsen, Judith F. Marks, Harold McGraw, III, Michael M. McNamara, Margaret L. O'Sullivan, Robert K. Ortberg, Otis Worldwide Corporation, Otis Worldwide Corporation 2020 Long-Term Incentive Plan, Otis Worldwide Corporation Company Automatic Contribution Excess Plan, Otis Worldwide Corporation Deferred Compensation Plan, Otis Worldwide Corporation LTIP Performance Share Unit Deferral Plan, Otis Worldwide Savings Restoration Plan, Margaret M. Preston, Denise L. Ramos, Raytheon Technologies Corporation, Frederic G. Reynolds, Brian C. Rogers, Shelley Stewart, Jr, Michael A. Todman, UTC Company Automatic Contribution Excess Plan, United Technologies Company Deferred Compensation Plan, United Technologies Company Performance Share Unit Deferral Plan, United Technologies Corporation 2018 Long-Term Incentive Compensation Plan, United Technologies Corporation Long-Term Incentive Plan, United Technologies Corporation Savings Restoration Plan, John H. Walker, Virginia M. Wilson* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Craig A. Raabe* *Izard, Kindall & Raabe LLP* *29 South Main Street, Suite 305* *West Hartford, CT 06107*. (Velez, F.)
August 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint, filed by Costas Loukellis, Christopher Doot, Alan Machuga, Dino DePellegrini, Geraud Darnis, Theresa MacKinnon, Michael Maurer, Bradley Hardesty, Roy Dion, Richard Sanfrey, David Carter, David Hess, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #4 Standing Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 8/13/2020. (Velez, F.)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/12/2020. (Velez, F.)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/12/2020. (Velez, F.)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/12/2020. (Velez, F.)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/11/2020; Discovery due by 2/11/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 3/18/2021. Signed by Clerk on 8/12/2020. (Velez, F.)
August 12, 2020 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 12, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Raabe, Craig)
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-6028897.), filed by Roy Dion, David Hess, Geraud Darnis, Christopher Doot, David Carter, Bradley Hardesty, Michael Maurer, Theresa MacKinnon, Costas Loukellis, Alan Machuga, Richard Sanfrey, Dino DePellegrini. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Raabe, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Darnis et al v. Raytheon Technologies Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Global Corporation Deferred Compensation Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederic G. Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher J. Kearney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shailesh G. Jejurikar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith F. Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia M. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Global Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UTC Company Automatic Contribution Excess Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John V. Faraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen J. Kullman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles M. Holley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otis Worldwide Corporation Deferred Compensation Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otis Worldwide Savings Restoration Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd J. Austin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret M. Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret L. O'Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold McGraw, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Technologies Company Deferred Compensation Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Technologies Corporation 2018 Long-Term Incentive Compensation Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey H. Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Global Corporation Company Automatic Contribution Excess Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Gitlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Technologies Corporation Long-Term Incentive Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Global Corporation 2020 Long-Term Incentive Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John J. Greisch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raytheon Technologies Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael M. McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert K. Ortberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane M. Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Todman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise L. Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otis Worldwide Corporation 2020 Long-Term Incentive Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Hopinkah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Technologies Corporation Savings Restoration Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otis Worldwide Corporation LTIP Performance Share Unit Deferral Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otis Worldwide Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall O. Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory J. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean-Pierre Garnier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian C. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Global Corporation Savings Restoration Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otis Worldwide Corporation Company Automatic Contribution Excess Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelley Stewart, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Technologies Company Performance Share Unit Deferral Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Global Corporation LTIP Performance Share Unit Deferral Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Maurer
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: Robert A. Izard, Jr.
Represented By: Mark P. Kindall
Represented By: Douglas Patrick Needham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Doot
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: Robert A. Izard, Jr.
Represented By: Mark P. Kindall
Represented By: Douglas Patrick Needham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Carter
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: Robert A. Izard, Jr.
Represented By: Mark P. Kindall
Represented By: Douglas Patrick Needham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa MacKinnon
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: Robert A. Izard, Jr.
Represented By: Mark P. Kindall
Represented By: Douglas Patrick Needham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraud Darnis
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: Robert A. Izard, Jr.
Represented By: Mark P. Kindall
Represented By: Douglas Patrick Needham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hess
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: Robert A. Izard, Jr.
Represented By: Mark P. Kindall
Represented By: Douglas Patrick Needham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Sanfrey
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: Robert A. Izard, Jr.
Represented By: Mark P. Kindall
Represented By: Douglas Patrick Needham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Dion
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: Robert A. Izard, Jr.
Represented By: Mark P. Kindall
Represented By: Douglas Patrick Needham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dino DePellegrini
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: Robert A. Izard, Jr.
Represented By: Mark P. Kindall
Represented By: Douglas Patrick Needham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Machuga
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: Robert A. Izard, Jr.
Represented By: Mark P. Kindall
Represented By: Douglas Patrick Needham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Hardesty
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: Robert A. Izard, Jr.
Represented By: Mark P. Kindall
Represented By: Douglas Patrick Needham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Costas Loukellis
Represented By: Craig A. Raabe
Represented By: Robert A. Izard, Jr.
Represented By: Mark P. Kindall
Represented By: Douglas Patrick Needham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?