Santana-Dunham v. Darien Library, Inc.
Plaintiff: Marcela Santana-Dunham
Defendant: Darien Library, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01193
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Case remanded to State Court Judicial District of Fairfield. (Johnson, D.)
August 28, 2020 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Johnson, D.)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The Court construes the (ECF No. #13 ) joint stipulation of remand as a motion to remand and that motion is GRANTED. The case is hereby remanded to state court. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 8/27/2020.(Gait, Emily)
August 20, 2020 Filing 13 Joint STIPULATION OF REMAND by Darien Library, Inc.. (Ruggiero, William)
August 18, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #7 MOTION to Strike filed by Marcela Santana-Dunham, #9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #10 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Notice (Other), #2 Notice of Appearance, #6 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Darien Library, Inc., #11 Protective Order, #1 Notice of Removal, #8 MOTION to Amend/Correct filed by Marcela Santana-Dunham, #3 Notice (Other) Signed by Clerk on 8/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases) (Peterson, M)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 08/17/2020. (Peterson, M)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 08/17/2020. (Peterson, M)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/16/2020. Discovery due by 2/16/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 3/23/2021. Signed by Clerk on 08/17/2020. (Peterson, M)
August 17, 2020 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 17, 2020 Filing 8 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Marcela Santana-Dunham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Anastasio, F.)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Strike Special Defenses by Marcela Santana-Dunham. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Defendant's Objection to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike)(Anastasio, F.)
August 17, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Darien Library, Inc.(Anastasio, F.)
August 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by The Darien Library, Inc. PURSUANT TO STANDING ORDER ON REMOVED CASES (Ruggiero, William)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Darien Library, Inc.. (Ruggiero, William)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by The Darien Library, Inc. OF PENDING MOTIONS (Ruggiero, William)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by William C. Ruggiero on behalf of The Darien Library, Inc. (Ruggiero, William)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Darien Library, Inc. from Connecticut Superior Court, case number FBT-cv19-6092340-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-6035975, filed by The Darien Library, Inc..(Ruggiero, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Santana-Dunham v. Darien Library, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darien Library, Inc.
Represented By: William C. Ruggiero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcela Santana-Dunham
Represented By: Scott R. Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?