Brett v. A-1 Auto Center, LLC
Plaintiff: Casey Brett
Defendant: A-1 Auto Center, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv01203
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Answer deadline updated for A-1 Auto Center, LLC to 10/21/2020. (Lewis, D)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/21/2020 respond to the complaint #1 Complaint. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 9/15/2020. (Lewis, D)
September 14, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/21/2020 respond to the complaint #1 Complaint by A-1 Auto Center, LLC. (Radshaw, John)
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Radshaw, III on behalf of A-1 Auto Center, LLC (Radshaw, John)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Casey Brett. A-1 Auto Center, LLC served on 8/31/2020, answer due 9/21/2020. (Reilly, Michael)
August 19, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Emanuele Robert Cicchiello on behalf of Casey Brett (Cicchiello, Emanuele)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *A-1 Auto Center, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael John Reilly* *Cicchiello & Cicchiello, LLP* *364 Franklin Avenue* *Hartford, CT 06114*. (Reis, Julia)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Casey Brett, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #4 Standing Protective Order, #5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Clerk on 8/18/2020. (Reis, Julia)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/18/2020. (Reis, Julia)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/18/2020. (Reis, Julia)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/18/2020. (Reis, Julia)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/17/2020. Discovery due by 2/17/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 3/24/2021. Signed by Clerk on 8/18/2020. (Reis, Julia)
August 18, 2020 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 18, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to A-1 Auto Center, LLC. (Reilly, Michael)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A-1 Auto Center, LLC ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-6038840.), filed by Casey Brett.(Reilly, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brett v. A-1 Auto Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Brett
Represented By: Michael John Reilly
Represented By: Emanuele Robert Cicchiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A-1 Auto Center, LLC
Represented By: John J. Radshaw, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?