Lagares v. Saul
Plaintiff: Diana Yvette Lagares
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2020cv01205
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Sarah A L Merriam
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:0405dc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Andrew M. Saul to 12/16/2020. (Katz, S.)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time until December 16, 2020, to File the Certified Administrative Record. The Court does not anticipate granting further extensions of this deadline. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 10/9/2020. (Katz, S.)
October 8, 2020 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until December 16, 2020 to File Certified Administrative Record by Andrew M. Saul. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration in Support)(Fitzhugh, Nicol)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. On August 19, 2020, the Clerk of the Court provided a copy of the Complaint to defendant by electronic mail, in accordance with the Standing Scheduling Order (Doc. #4 at 2). Defendant shall file a copy of the Administrative Transcript on or before October 19, 2020. As counsel are aware, the 60-day deadline for filing of the Administrative Transcript constitutes an extension of the otherwise applicable deadlines in civil cases; as such, requests for extensions of time are discouraged, and unless circumstances dictate otherwise, counsel should generally not seek extensions. Counsel for defendant is hereby placed on notice that if any motion for an extension of time to file the Administrative Transcript is filed, such motion must set forth the date on which counsel requested the preparation of the transcript. That information will help the Court assess the diligence of defendant, and thus, whether any extension of the filing deadline is warranted. See D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 7(b)(1) (providing that "good cause" for extension of a deadline "requires a particularized showing that the" deadline cannot be met "despite the diligence" of the moving party). It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 9/10/2020. (Katz, S.)
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Diana Yvette Lagares, Andrew M. Saul. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam. This matter has been transferred to a magistrate judge. All non-efiled submissions should be filed at the seat of court where the magistrate judge presides. The case number will remain the same, but must be followed by the magistrate judge's initials. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/10/2020.(Anastasio, F.)
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE by Diana Yvette Lagares Notice, Consent & Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge (Ciccarillo, Dennis)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REMINDER: STANDING ORDER ON SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Anastasio, F.)
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicol Fitzhugh on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Fitzhugh, Nicol)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff has filed a motion seeking to proceed without payment of fees and costs, which motion includes a sworn statement as to plaintiff's current financial circumstances. See Doc. #2 . Plaintiff has completed the required information. Plaintiff asserts that she is unable to afford to pay fees and costs, having no employment income and minimal assets. See generally id. at 3-4. Plaintiff also states that she receives $219 in monthly benefits "plus $509 food stamps[,]" which just covers her monthly expenses. Id. at 3-5 (sic). At this stage, such allegations are sufficient to establish that plaintiff is unable to pay the ordinary filing fees required by the Court. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1). Accordingly, plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 8/19/2020. (Katz, S.)
August 18, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Andrew M. Saul to 10/17/2020. (Oliver, T.)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/18/2020. (Oliver, T.)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing Scheduling Order Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/18/2020. (Oliver, T.)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing Order on Social Security Appeals. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent form) (Oliver, T.)
August 18, 2020 Judge Stefan R. Underhill and Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam added. Motions referred to Sarah A. L. Merriam(Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Diana Yvette Lagares. (Ciccarillo, Dennis)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Diana Yvette Lagares.(Ciccarillo, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lagares v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Yvette Lagares
Represented By: Dennis G. Ciccarillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Nicol Fitzhugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?