Giordano v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Maria Giordano
Defendant: CR Bard Inc, Does 1 through 100 Inclusive, McKesson Corporation, Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. and C R Bard Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2020cv01211
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
Presiding Judge: Victor A Bolden
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew E Brown on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Incorporated with Certificate of Service (Brown, Matthew)
October 5, 2020 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #37 MOTION for Attorney(s) Matthew E. Brown to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6060137) by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Incorporated. (Brown, Matthew)
September 16, 2020 Party McKesson Corporation Terminated. Based on the #39 stipulation of dismissal, all claims against McKesson Corporation are dismissed without prejudice, with each party bearing its own costs and fees. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 9/16/2020. (Tisdale, I.)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #41 Motion to Amend/Correct and #40 Motion to Stay. Discovery, all pretrial deadlines, and an initial scheduling conference are hereby stayed until December 18, 2020, at which time the parties must submit a status report on the case. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 9/15/2020. (Tisdale, I.)
September 14, 2020 Filing 41 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #40 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines [correction made to caption only] by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Incorporated.Responses due by 10/5/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order)(Uiterwyk, Patrick)
September 9, 2020 Filing 40 Joint MOTION to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Incorporated.Responses due by 9/30/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order)(Uiterwyk, Patrick)
September 9, 2020 Filing 39 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party McKesson Corporation without Prejudice by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Incorporated, McKesson Corporation. (Uiterwyk, Patrick)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Matthew E. Brown. Certificate of Good Standing due by 10/27/2020. Signed by Clerk on 8/28/2020. (Imbriani, Susan)
August 27, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for Attorney(s) Matthew E. Brown to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-6060137) by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Incorporated, McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit)(Uiterwyk, Patrick)
August 27, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Thomas Uiterwyk on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Incorporated, McKesson Corporation with certificate of service (Uiterwyk, Patrick)
August 19, 2020 Filing 35 Notice to counsel in transferred case. Signed by Clerk on 8/19/2020. (Oliver, T.)
August 19, 2020 Filing 34 NOTICE: ANY MOTIONS PENDING AT THE TIME OF TRANSFER MUST BE REFILED IN OUR DISTRICT. Signed by Clerk on 8/19/2020. (Oliver, T.)
August 19, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 8/19/2020.(Oliver, T.)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/19/2020.(Oliver, T.)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/19/2020.(Oliver, T.)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/18/2020 Discovery due by 2/18/2021 Dispositive Motions due by 3/25/2021 Signed by Clerk on 8/19/2020. (Oliver, T.)
August 19, 2020 Filing 29 Case electronically transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:20-cv-02267.
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #25 Unopposed Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out-of-State Plaintiffs' Cases. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows: a. Plaintiff Maria Giordano's case be severed and transferred to the New HavenDivision of the District of Connecticut (Civil case 3:20-cv-2267-S opened); b. Plaintiff Peggy Grindstaff's case be severed and transferred to the Greenville Division of the Eastern District of Tennessee (Civil case 3:20-cv-2268-S opened); c. Plaintiff Andrew Holness's case be severed and transferred to the White Plains Division of the Southern District of New York (Civil case 3:20-cv-2269-S opened); d. Plaintiff Adrian Martinez's case be severed and transferred to the Kansas City Division of the Western District of Missouri (Civil case 3:20-cv-2270-S opened); e. Plaintiff Jerry Mickens's case be severed and transferred to the Richmond Division of the Eastern District of Virginia (Civil case 3:20-cv-2271-S opened); f. Plaintiff Kelley Munzings case be severed and transferred to the Richmond Division of the Eastern District of Virginia (Civil case 3:20-cv-2272-S opened); g. Plaintiff Stephanie Phillips's case be severed and transferred to the Columbus Division of the Middle District of Georgia (Civil case 3:20-cv-2273-S opened); h. Plaintiff Joseph Ronga's case be severed and transferred to the Fort Lauderdale Division of the Southern District of Florida (Civil case 3:20-cv-2274-S opened). Plaintiff Nathan Fee is the sole plaintiff with any connection to this forum. Accordingly, he shall remain in the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/18/2020) (axm)
August 12, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc re: #25 Amended MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases, #21 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa)
August 11, 2020 Filing 26 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Nathan Fee, Maria Giordano, Peggy Grindstaff, Andrea Holness, Adrian Martinez, Jerry Mickens, Kelley Munzing, Stephanie Phillips, Joseph Ronga re #25 Amended MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven)
August 11, 2020 Filing 25 Amended MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Nathan Fee, Maria Giordano, Peggy Grindstaff, Andrea Holness, Adrian Martinez, Jerry Mickens, Kelley Munzing, Stephanie Phillips, Joseph Ronga (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven)
July 31, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation re: #21 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa)
July 29, 2020 Filing 23 Appendix in Support filed by Nathan Fee, Maria Giordano, Peggy Grindstaff, Andrea Holness, Adrian Martinez, Jerry Mickens, Kelley Munzing, Stephanie Phillips, Joseph Ronga re #21 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases Including Declaration and Exhibits (Schulte, Steven)
July 29, 2020 Filing 22 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Nathan Fee, Maria Giordano, Peggy Grindstaff, Andrea Holness, Adrian Martinez, Jerry Mickens, Kelley Munzing, Stephanie Phillips, Joseph Ronga re #21 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven)
July 29, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Nathan Fee, Maria Giordano, Peggy Grindstaff, Andrea Holness, Adrian Martinez, Jerry Mickens, Kelley Munzing, Stephanie Phillips, Joseph Ronga (Schulte, Steven)
July 29, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE filed by Nathan Fee, Maria Giordano, Peggy Grindstaff, Andrea Holness, Adrian Martinez, Jerry Mickens, Kelley Munzing, Stephanie Phillips, Joseph Ronga re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Schulte, Steven)
July 22, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Responses) (Matthews, Melissa)
July 22, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms For Each Plaintiff filed by Nathan Fee, Maria Giordano, Peggy Grindstaff, Andrea Holness, Adrian Martinez, Jerry Mickens, Kelley Munzing, Stephanie Phillips, Joseph Ronga (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Schulte, Steven)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: To assist the Court, counsel for all parties shall complete the form attached hereto as Exhibit A for each Plaintiff in this action. The parties shall file their completed forms on or before 7/22/2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/16/2020) (mla)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court grants the parties' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/1/2020) (ctf)
June 29, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #9 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Nathan Fee, Maria Giordano, Peggy Grindstaff, Andrea Holness, Adrian Martinez, Jerry Mickens, Kelley Munzing, Stephanie Phillips, Joseph Ronga (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven)
June 15, 2020 Filing 14 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #9 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction As Amended (Junek, Jessica)
June 15, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 13 replaced with the flattened document on 6/18/2020) (pnp).
June 15, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation (Junek, Jessica)
June 15, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc (Junek, Jessica)
June 15, 2020 Filing 10 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #9 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Junek, Jessica)
June 15, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation Attorney Jessica Junek added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft) (Junek, Jessica)
June 10, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 8 replaced with flattened document on 6/11/2020) (awc).
June 10, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CR Bard Inc. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 7 replaced with flattened document on 6/11/2020) (awc).
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The above-referenced matter is transferred to the docket of the Honorable Judge Karen Gren Scholer, who has a related case. All future pleadings shall be filed under case number 3:20-CV-1484-S. Judge David C Godbey no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/9/2020) (twd)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to confer within 14 days of the date of this Order and report to the Court within 14 days after the conference the parties' position. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/8/2020) (mla)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh)
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Matthews, Melissa) Modified Docket Text on 6/9/2020 (oyh).
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc (Matthews, Melissa) Modified Docket Text on 6/9/2020 (oyh).
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10897774) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement, #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson Corporation, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Court Documents, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 - State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 - Plaintiff's Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 - Civil Case Info Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 - Citation Issued to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 - Citation Issued to C.R. Bard, #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 - Citation Issued to McKesson Corporation, #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 - Status Conference Order, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 - Return of Service - C.R. Bard, #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 - Status Conference Order, #16 Exhibit(s) D-10 - Return of Service - Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.) (Matthews, Melissa) Modified Docket Text on 6/9/2020 (oyh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Giordano v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Giordano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CR Bard Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Uiterwyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew E Brown
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Uiterwyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Matthew E Brown
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Uiterwyk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?