Currytto v. Doe et al
Plaintiff: Kevin W. Currytto
Defendant: Jane Doe, Preston, Richard Furey, Dorsko, Leonard Santassico, John Doe, J. Wright, Connecticut Dept of Corr, Chris Doe, J Bretton, Hiedi O'Connor, Tiffany Dyle, S Beckford and UCONN Correctional Managed Health
Case Number: 3:2020cv01213
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Standing Order re: Initial Discovery Disclosures Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/14/2020. (Peterson, M)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 For the reasons set forth in the attached, the Court issues the following orders:The claims against defendants UCONN Correctional Managed Health Care and Connecticut Department of Correction, and the deliberate indifference to medical needs claims against non-medical defendants, Officers John Doe #1-3, are DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b)(1). The deliberate indifference claims against defendants Chris Doe, Dyle, and Jane Doe based on allegedly inadequate treatment are DISMISSED but the associated state law negligence claims will proceed.The case also will proceed on the plaintiff's claim for deliberate indifference to medical needs and his related state law negligence/medical malpractice claims against Santassico, Nurse Doe #1, Furey, Preston, Bretton, Wright, Dyle, Beckford, OConnor, Dorsko, and Officer Doe, and the retaliation claim against Beckford and Nurse Doe. The plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel [ECF No. 3] is DENIED without prejudice.The Court enters the following additional orders:(1) The Clerk shall verify the current work address for defendants Santassico, Furey, Preston, Bretton, Wright, Dyle, Beckford, OConnor, Dorsko, and Nurse Chris Doe with the Department of Correction Office of Legal Affairs, mail a waiver of service of process request packet containing the Complaint and this Order to each defendant at the address provided within twenty-one (21) days of this Order, and report to the court on the status of the waiver request on the thirty-fifth day after mailing. If any defendant fails to return the waiver request, the Clerk shall make arrangements for in-person service by the U.S. Marshals Service on the defendant in his or her individual capacity and the defendant shall be required to pay the cost of such service.(2) The Clerk shall send the plaintiff a copy of this Order.(3) The Clerk shall send a courtesy copy of the Complaint and this Order to the Connecticut Attorney General and the Department of Correction Office of Legal Affairs.(4) The defendants shall file their response to the complaint, either an answer or motion to dismiss, within sixty (60) days from the date the waiver forms are sent. If they choose to file an answer, they shall admit or deny the allegations and respond to the cognizable claim recited above. They also may include all additional defenses permitted by the Federal Rules.(5) Discovery, pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26 through 37, shall be completed within seven months (210 days) from the date of this order. Discovery requests need not be filed with the court.(6) All motions for summary judgment shall be filed within eight months (240 days) from the date of this order.(7) Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 7(a), a nonmoving party must respond to a dispositive motion within twenty-one (21) days of the date the motion was filed. If no response is filed, or the response is not timely, the dispositive motion can be granted absent objection.(8) The Court cannot effect service on any of the Doe defendants without their full names and current work addresses. The plaintiff is directed to obtain his information and provide it to the Court. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/13/2020. (Gait, Emily)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If you change your address at any time during the litigation of this case, Local Rule 83.1(c)2 provides that you notify the court. Failure to do so can result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I Garfinkel on 9/10/20. (Payton, R.)
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Kevin W. Currytto. (Payton, R.)
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 Notice to petitioner re: Insufficiency #2 Ledger Sheet. You must submit a Ledger Sheet showing the past six months. If insufficiency not corrected Dismissal due by 9/17/2020 Signed by US Magistrate Judge William I Garfinkel on 8/27/20.(Payton, R.)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 8/19/2020. (Fanelle, N.)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Prisoner E-Filing Standing Order on Prisoner Electronic Filing Program Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/19/2020. (Fanelle, N.)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 8/19/2020. (Fanelle, N.)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 PRISCS Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Kevin W. Currytto. (Fanelle, N.)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 PRISCS MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Kevin W. Currytto. (Fanelle, N.)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 PRISCS MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kevin W. Currytto. (Fanelle, N.)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 PRISCS COMPLAINT against S Beckford, J Bretton, Connecticut Dept. of Corrections, Chris Doe, Jane Doe, Jane Doe(Nurse), Jane Doe(Officer(s)), John Doe(Officer(s) # 2), John Doe(Officer(s) # 1), John Doe(Officer(s) # 3), John Doe(Dr.), John Doe(Nurse), Dorsko, Tiffany Dyle, Richard Furey, Hiedi O'Connor, Preston, Leonard Santassico, UCONN Correctional Managed Health, J. Wright, filed by Kevin W. Currytto. (Fanelle, N.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Currytto v. Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Furey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorsko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard Santassico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connecticut Dept of Corr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Bretton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hiedi O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Dyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S Beckford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UCONN Correctional Managed Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin W. Currytto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?