Volpe v. Drogo et al
Plaintiff: Brooke Volpe
Defendant: Sam Drogo doing business as Sam Drogo & Sons Trucking and Samuel C. Drogo
Case Number: 3:2020cv01218
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 13 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Vossler, Christopher)
October 2, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory J. Sachs on behalf of Brooke Volpe ct14736 (Sachs, Gregory)
August 21, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Sam Drogo, Samuel C. Drogo, #2 Notice (Other) filed by Sam Drogo, Samuel C. Drogo, #3 Notice (Other) filed by Sam Drogo, Samuel C. Drogo, #4 Notice of Appearance filed by Sam Drogo, Samuel C. Drogo, #5 Jury Demand filed by Sam Drogo, Samuel C. Drogo, #6 Notice (Other) filed by Sam Drogo, Samuel C. Drogo, #7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #8 Electronic Filing Order, #9 Standing Protective Order, #10 Standing Order re: Discovery. Signed by Clerk on 8/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removals)(Reis, Julia)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/20/2020. (Reis, Julia)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/20/2020. (Reis, Julia)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/20/2020. (Reis, Julia)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/19/2020. Discovery due by 2/19/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 3/26/2021. Signed by Clerk on 8/20/2020. (Reis, Julia)
August 20, 2020 Judge Janet C. Hall added. (Oliver, T.)
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Samuel C. Drogo, Sam Drogo re #1 Notice of Removal, (Compliance with Standing Order in Removed Cases) (Vossler, Christopher) Modified on 8/20/2020 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Samuel C. Drogo, Sam Drogo. (Vossler, Christopher) Modified on 8/20/2020 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Vossler on behalf of Samuel C. Drogo, Sam Drogo (Vossler, Christopher) Modified on 8/20/2020 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Samuel C. Drogo, Sam Drogo re #1 Notice of Removal, (Notice of Pending Motions) (Vossler, Christopher) Modified on 8/20/2020 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Samuel C. Drogo, Sam Drogo re #1 Notice of Removal, (Certficate of Filing & Service of Notice of Removal) (Vossler, Christopher) Modified on 8/20/2020 to correct party (Hushin, Z.).
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sam Drogo, Samuel C. Drogo from Middletown, case number MMX-CV-20-6029064. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-6044076, filed by Sam Drogo, Samuel C. Drogo.(Vossler, Christopher) Modified on 8/20/2020 to correct parties (Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Volpe v. Drogo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Drogo doing business as Sam Drogo & Sons Trucking
Represented By: Christopher M. Vossler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel C. Drogo
Represented By: Christopher M. Vossler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke Volpe
Represented By: Gregory J. Sachs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?