Sisouvong v. Saul
Plaintiff: Billy Sisouvong
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Interested Party: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2020cv01220
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Janet C Hall
Referring Judge: Sarah A L Merriam
2 Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until December 2, 2020 to File Certified Administrative Record by Andrew M. Saul. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration in Support)(Fitzhugh, Nicol)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Absent consent to a Magistrate Judge, the case is reassigned to Judge Janet C. Hall for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 9/22/2020.(Anastasio, F.)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REMINDER: STANDING ORDER ON SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Anastasio, F.)
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicol Fitzhugh on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Fitzhugh, Nicol)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff has filed a motion seeking to proceed without payment of fees and costs, which motion includes a sworn statement as to plaintiff's current financial circumstances. See Doc. #3 . Plaintiff has completed the required information. He asserts that he is unable to afford to pay fees and costs, having no assets or employment income. See generally id. at 3-5. Plaintiff asserts that he has been unemployed since 2013. See id. at 3. Plaintiff also asserts that he "[r]eceives $196/mo in food stamps[,]" that he "[f]iled bankruptcy last yr[,]" and that he "[h]as been unable to pay rent in seven months[]" resulting in a debt of approximately $3,500 owed to his landlord. Id. at 5. At this stage, such allegations are sufficient to establish that plaintiff is unable to pay the ordinary filing fees required by the Court. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1). Accordingly, plaintiff's #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 8/21/2020. (Spangenburg, S.)
August 19, 2020 Answer deadline updated for Andrew M. Saul to 10/18/2020. (Reis, Julia)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/19/2020. (Reis, Julia)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/19/2020. (Reis, Julia)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Standing Order on Social Security Appeals Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 8/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Reis, Julia)
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Billy Sisouvong. (Reis, Julia)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ivan Michael Katz on behalf of Billy Sisouvong (Reis, Julia)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Billy Sisouvong. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reis, Julia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sisouvong v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Sisouvong
Represented By: Ivan Michael Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Nicol Fitzhugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?