Jumpp v. Simonow et al
Plaintiff: Junior Jumpp
Defendant: Ingrid Feder, Nancy J. Simonow, Kim Fletchette, Robert Martin, Oles and Leslie Bumpus
Case Number: 3:2020cv01225
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Kari A Dooley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for An Immediate Order by Junior Jumpp. (Fanelle, N.)
October 14, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE to The Court for Review by Junior Jumpp. (Fanelle, N.)
October 14, 2020 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Leslie Bumpus waiver sent on 9/30/2020, answer due 11/29/2020; Kim Fletchette waiver sent on 9/30/2020, answer due 11/29/2020 filed by Junior Jumpp. (Fanelle, N.)
October 8, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Oles waiver sent on 9/30/2020, answer due 11/29/2020 filed by Junior Jumpp. (Fanelle, N.)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Clarification; denying #16 Motion for Order. By way of clarification, the Court did NOT grant injunctive relief when issuing the Initial Review Order. Accordingly, the motion to enforce any such order is denied. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 10/7/20. (Dooley, Kari)
October 6, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for an Order enforcing IRO, Injunctive Relief Order by Junior Jumpp. (Fanelle, N.)
September 30, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Clarification #12 Initial Review Order - Prisoner, by Junior Jumpp. (Payton, R.)
September 30, 2020 USM 285 forms together with Summons, Complaint, Order granting IFP, IRO, Admin Directive, and Standing Order re: Discovery reviewed and brought down to the USM Office in Bridgeport for service on defendants Simonow, Fletchette, Bumpus, Feder, Martin, and Oles. Marshals Return of Service on Summons due by 10/20/2020. (Fanelle, N.)
September 30, 2020 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Leslie Bumpus, Ingrid Feder, Kim Fletchette, Robert Martin, Oles, Nancy J. Simonow* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *Junior Jumpp #345844* *CORRIGAN-RADGOWSKI CORRECTIONAL CENTER* *986 Norwich-New London Turnpike* *Uncasville, CT 06382*. (Fanelle, N.)
September 30, 2020 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Simonow, Fletchette, Bumpus, Feder, Martin, and Oles on 9/30/2020 by Junior Jumpp. Waiver of Service due by 11/4/2020. (Fanelle, N.)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Standing Order Re: Initial Discovery Disclosures Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/23/2020. (Fanelle, N.)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL REVIEW ORDER and order GRANTING #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Junior Jumpp, GRANTING #10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Junior Jumpp. See attached Order. Discovery due by 4/24/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 5/24/2021. Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 9/23/2020.(Gould, K.)
September 16, 2020 Filing 11 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Junior Jumpp. (Payton, R.)
September 16, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Junior Jumpp. (Payton, R.) Modified on 9/23/2020 (Gould, K.).
September 2, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ingrid Feder, Kim Fletchette, Robert Martin, Nancy J. Simonow, Leslie Bumpus, Oles, filed by Junior Jumpp.(Payton, R.)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - See attached Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 8/28/2020.(Gould, K.)
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 EXHIBIT by Junior Jumpp. (Fanelle, N.)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 8/20/2020. (Oliver, T.)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Prisoner E-Filing Standing Order on Prisoner Electronic Filing Program Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/20/2020. (Oliver, T.)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on 8/20/2020. (Oliver, T.)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 PRISCS - Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Junior Jumpp. (Oliver, T.)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 PRISCS - MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Junior Jumpp. (Oliver, T.) Modified on 9/23/2020 (Gould, K.).
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 PRISCS - COMPLAINT against Ingrid Feder, Kim Fletchette, Robert Martin, Nancy J. Simonow, filed by Junior Jumpp. (Attachments: #1 copy of letter) (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jumpp v. Simonow et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Junior Jumpp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingrid Feder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy J. Simonow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Fletchette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Bumpus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?