Townsend v. Castillo et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Townsend, Jr.
Defendant: Davis, Berkowski, Maiga, Caron, Comette, Butricks, Clark, Castillo, McClendon, Warren, Mulligan, Carlos, McNiel, Hewitt, Elmore, Cooper, Kenny and Crandall
Case Number: 3:2020cv01241
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason DePatie on behalf of Timothy Townsend, Jr (DePatie, Jason)
October 19, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald P. Dwyer, Jr on behalf of Timothy Townsend, Jr (Dwyer, Gerald)
October 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying as moot #4 Motion for TRO; denying as moot #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/18/2020. (Simon, K)
October 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Relief from Appointment. Attorneys Jason H. DePatie and Gerald P. Dwyer, Jr. of the law firm of Robinson & Cole are appointed in Attorney Kindall's stead. Attorneys DePatie and Dwyer are directed to file an appearance in accordance with Local Rule 5(b) within 14 days of this order. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/3/2020. (Simon, K)
October 2, 2020 Filing 26 OBJECTION re #16 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Butricks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Lt. Ouellette, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Director Maiga, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Deputy Warden Nunez, #4 Exhibit D - Disciplinary Report No. CR19-12-027, #5 Exhibit E - Inmate Townsend Requests, #6 Exhibit F - Disciplinary Report No. CCIC-2020-04-065, #7 Exhibit G - Inmate Townsend Recent Disciplinary History)(McChesney, Jacob)
September 30, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Relief from Appointment re 22 Order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel,, Mark P. Kindall by Timothy Townsend, Jr.Responses due by 10/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kindall, Mark)
September 24, 2020 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Timothy Townsend, Jr. (Oliver, T.)
September 23, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE to Pro Bono Counsel re Incurring Expenses. Signed by Clerk on 9/23/2020.(Freberg, B)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel Mark P. Kindall for Timothy Townsend, Jr pursuant to D. Conn L. Civ. R 83.10. Counsel is directed to contact their client and file an appearance in accordance with Local Rule 5(b) within 14 days.Counsel is further directed to review the Notice Regarding Local Rule 83.10(k): Incurring Pro Bono Expenses and Local Rule 83.10(k) (copies available on the courts website at: http://ctd.uscourts.gov/pro-bono-information-0). Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/23/2020.(Freberg, B)
September 23, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE re #18 Notice (Other) filed by Butricks. (McChesney, Jacob)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Townsend's counsel will send Townsend a copy of the objection that he requests in doc. no. 18. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/22/2020. (Simon, K)
September 21, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Timothy Townsend, Jr. (Oliver, T.)
September 21, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE by Timothy Townsend, Jr re #15 Objection, #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Oliver, T.)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: The defendants are directed to respond to the Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction (doc. no. 16) by October 2, 2020. Show Cause Response due by 10/2/2020. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/16/2020. (Simon, K)
September 15, 2020 Filing 16 SECOND MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Responses due by 10/6/2020, ) by Timothy Townsend, Jr. (Oliver, T.)
September 11, 2020 Filing 15 OBJECTION re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Butricks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Director David Maiga)(McChesney, Jacob)
September 11, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob McChesney on behalf of Butricks in his Official Capacity only (McChesney, Jacob)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If you change your address at any time during the litigation of this case, Local Rule 83.1(c)2 provides that you notify the court. Failure to do so can result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I Garfinkel on 9/2/20. (Payton, R.)
September 1, 2020 Filing 12 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Timothy Townsend, Jr. (Payton, R.)
September 1, 2020 Filing 11 SECOND DECLARATION re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Timothy Townsend, Jr. (Payton, R.)
August 28, 2020 Filing 10 Notice to petitioner re: Insufficiency #2 Ledger Sheet. You must submit a Ledger Sheet showing the past six months transactions. If insufficiency not corrected Dismissal due by 9/18/2020 Signed by US Magistrate Judge William I Garfinkel on 8/28/20.(Payton, R.)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER ON PRISONER ELECTRONIC FILING PROGRAM Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 08/25/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 08/25/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 08/25/2020.(Fazekas, J.)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 PRISCS - PROPOSED ORDER by Timothy Townsend, Jr re #1 Complaint. (Fazekas, J.)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 PRISCS - NOTICE of Application by Timothy Townsend, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Fazekas, J.) Modified on 9/2/2020 to add prefix (Fazekas, J.).
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 PRISCS - MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Responses due by 9/15/2020, ) by Timothy Townsend, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration)(Fazekas, J.) Modified on 8/26/2020 to add prefix (Fazekas, J.).
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 PRISCS - Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Timothy Townsend, Jr. (Fazekas, J.)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 PRISCS - MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Timothy Townsend, Jr. (Fazekas, J.)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 PRISCS - COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Timothy Townsend, Jr.(Fazekas, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Townsend v. Castillo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maiga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Comette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butricks
Represented By: Jacob McChesney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McClendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mulligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McNiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crandall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Townsend, Jr.
Represented By: Mark P. Kindall
Represented By: Gerald P. Dwyer, Jr.
Represented By: Jason DePatie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?