Pasciutti v. LiquidPiston, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Pasciutti
Defendant: Alexander Shkolnik and LiquidPiston, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01243
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Re: #12 Notice of Request for Prefiling Conference filed by LiquidPiston, Inc., Alexander Shkolnik. The prefiling conference requirement is hereby waived. The defendants may filed their motion to dismiss without a prefiling conference. So ordered. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 10/20/2020. (Rickevicius, L.)
October 20, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by LiquidPiston, Inc., Alexander Shkolnik re #1 Complaint re: Request for Pre-Filing Conference to file Motion to Dismiss (Fishberg, Mitchell)
September 25, 2020 Answer deadline updated for All Defendants. (Rickevicius, L.)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 11/1/2020 to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 9/25/2020. (Rickevicius, L.)
September 25, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/01/2020 to Plead #1 Complaint by LiquidPiston, Inc., Alexander Shkolnik. (Fishberg, Mitchell)
September 25, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mitchell L. Fishberg on behalf of LiquidPiston, Inc., Alexander Shkolnik (Fishberg, Mitchell)
September 22, 2020 Docket Entry Correction re #8 Summons Returned Executed. Docket text modified to correct "served on" and "answer" dates. LiquidPiston, Inc. served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020 (changed from 9/10/2020 and 10/1/2020 respectively); Alexander Shkolnik served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020(changed from 9/11/2020 and 10/2/2020 respectively). (Bozek, M.)
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Pasciutti. LiquidPiston, Inc. served on 9/11/2020, answer due 10/2/2020; Alexander Shkolnik served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020. (Paradisi, Matthew) Modified on 9/22/2020 to correct served on and answer dates (Bozek, M.).
August 26, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *LiquidPiston, Inc., Alexander Shkolnik* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Matthew D. Paradisi* *Cicchiello & Cicchiello, LLP* *364 Franklin Avenue* *Hartford, CT 06114*. (Agati, Kathryn)
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph Pasciutti, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Standing Protective Order, #1 Complaint filed by Joseph Pasciutti, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 8/26/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/25/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/25/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/24/2020, Discovery due by 2/24/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 3/31/2021. Signed by Clerk on 8/25/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
August 25, 2020 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 25, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to LiquidPiston, Inc., Alexander Shkolnik. (Paradisi, Matthew)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Emanuele Robert Cicchiello on behalf of Joseph Pasciutti (Cicchiello, Emanuele)
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LiquidPiston, Inc., Alexander Shkolnik ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-6053904.), filed by Joseph Pasciutti.(Paradisi, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pasciutti v. LiquidPiston, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Pasciutti
Represented By: Matthew D. Paradisi
Represented By: Emanuele Robert Cicchiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Shkolnik
Represented By: Mitchell L. Fishberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LiquidPiston, Inc.
Represented By: Mitchell L. Fishberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?