Smith v. Wal-Mart Real Estate
Plaintiff: Shawn Smith
Defendant: Wal-Mart Real Estate doing business as Wal-Mart Realty Co doing business as Wal-Mart Associates, Inc doing business as Walmart, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01244
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Robert N Chatigny
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying as moot #18 Motion for Extension of Time in light of ECF No. 19. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 10/9/2020. (Rickevicius, L.)
October 8, 2020 Filing 19 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Springer, George)
September 23, 2020 Filing 18 First MOTION for Extension of Time until Court decides Motion to Remand 26 (f) Report by Shawn Smith. (McHugh, Lori)
September 23, 2020 Filing 17 Memorandum in Support re #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Shawn Smith. (McHugh, Lori)
September 23, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Shawn Smith.Responses due by 10/14/2020 (McHugh, Lori)
September 23, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Lori L. McHugh on behalf of Shawn Smith Plaintiff (McHugh, Lori)
August 26, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Real Estate, Wal-Mart Realty Company, Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Walmart, Inc. Of Service of Court Orders in Removed Cases (Springer, George)
August 26, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #11 Standing Protective Order, #1 Notice of Removal filed by Wal-Mart Real Estate, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Wal-Mart Real Estate, #9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #10 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Answer to Complaint filed by Wal-Mart Real Estate, #5 Notice (Other) filed by Wal-Mart Real Estate, Walmart, Inc., #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Wal-Mart Real Estate, #8 Notice of Appearance filed by Wal-Mart Real Estate, #4 Notice (Other) filed by Wal-Mart Real Estate, Walmart, Inc., #6 Notice (Other) filed by Wal-Mart Real Estate. Signed by Clerk on 8/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 STANDING ORDER ON REMOVED CASES) (Agati, Kathryn)
August 25, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO THE BAR OF THE US DISTRICT COURT OF CONNECTICUT Re: Local Rule 83.1 Admission of Attorneys. The above captioned case has been received and filed in our court. Please see our Local Rule 83.1 regarding Admission of Attorneys that is available on our website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. You will not be added to the case, nor will we accept further filings until you have complied with Local Rule 83.1. If you have any questions about this procedure, please contact the Clerk's Office. Signed by Clerk on 8/25/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/25/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 8/25/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/24/2020, Discovery due by 2/24/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 3/31/2021. Signed by Clerk on 8/25/2020. (Agati, Kathryn)
August 25, 2020 Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 25, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Katie Ann Roy on behalf of Wal-Mart Real Estate (Roy, Katie) Modified on 8/25/2020 to correct parties (Hushin, Z.).
August 25, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Real Estate identifying Corporate Parent Walmart, Inc., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Other Affiliate Wal-Mart Realty Company for Wal-Mart Real Estate. (Springer, George) Modified on 8/25/2020 to correct parties (Hushin, Z.).
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Real Estate. Defendant's Statement Regarding Removed Case (Springer, George) Modified on 8/25/2020 to correct parties(Hushin, Z.).
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Real Estate. of Pending Motions (Springer, George) Modified on 8/25/2020 to correct paries (Hushin, Z.).
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Real Estate. Certificate of Filing Copy of Notice of Removal in State Court (Springer, George) Modified on 8/25/2020 to correct parties (Hushin, Z.).
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Wal-Mart Real Estate.(Springer, George) Modified on 8/25/2020 to correct parties (Hushin, Z.).
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by George C. Springer, Jr on behalf of Wal-Mart Real Estate. (Springer, George) Modified on 8/25/2020 to correct parties (Hushin, Z.).
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Real Estate from Waterbury, case number UWY-CV20-6055995-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-6054000, filed by Wal-Mart Real Estate.(Springer, George) Modified on 8/25/2020 to correct parties(Hushin, Z.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Wal-Mart Real Estate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Smith
Represented By: Lori L. McHugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Real Estate doing business as Wal-Mart Realty Co doing business as Wal-Mart Associates, Inc doing business as Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Katie Ann Roy
Represented By: George C. Springer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?