Meade v. Walmart, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jazmyne Meade
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01266
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Alfred V Covello
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Set Deadlines: Discovery due by 5/27/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 6/4/2021; Trial Brief due by 7/2/2021; Trial Ready Date 8/6/2021. (Velez, F.)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: discovery due by 5/7/2021; dispositive motions due by 6/4/2021; trial brief due by 7/2/2021; and trial ready date 8/6/2021. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 09/25/20. (Codeanne, K.)
September 24, 2020 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Springer, George)
September 24, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter M. Appleton on behalf of Jazmyne Meade ,Plaintiff (Appleton, Peter)
September 1, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Notice of Removal filed by Walmart, Inc., #8 Notice of Appearance filed by Walmart, Inc., #5 Notice (Other) filed by Walmart, Inc., #6 Notice (Other) filed by Walmart, Inc., #9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Walmart, Inc., #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Walmart, Inc., #4 Notice (Other) filed by Walmart, Inc., #10 Electronic Filing Order, and #3 Answer to Complaint filed by Walmart, Inc. Signed by Clerk on 9/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order on Removed Cases)(Bozek, M.)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 8/27/2020.(Bozek, M.)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/26/2020. Discovery due by 2/26/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 4/2/2021. Signed by Clerk on 8/27/2020.(Bozek, M.)
August 27, 2020 Judge Alfred V. Covello added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Katie Ann Roy on behalf of Walmart, Inc. (Roy, Katie)
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Walmart, Inc. for Walmart, Inc.. (Springer, George)
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Walmart, Inc. Defendant's Statement Regarding Removed Case (Springer, George)
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Walmart, Inc. of Pending Motions (Springer, George)
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Walmart, Inc. Certificate of Filing Copy of Notice of Removal in State Court (Springer, George)
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Walmart, Inc..(Springer, George)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by George C. Springer, Jr on behalf of Walmart, Inc. (Springer, George)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart, Inc. from Hartford, case number HHD-CV20-6131849-S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-6060065, filed by Walmart, Inc..(Springer, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meade v. Walmart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Katie Ann Roy
Represented By: George C. Springer, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jazmyne Meade
Represented By: Peter M. Appleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?