Castillo v. Swift Transportation Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sandra Castillo
Defendant: Swift Transportation Services, LLC, Hector Hernandez, Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc., Swift Transportation Company of Arizona and Swift Services Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01291
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Case remanded to State Court Judicial District of New Britain. (Shafer, J.)
October 6, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE TO #18 Order,, by Hector Hernandez, Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc., Swift Services Holdings, Inc., Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, Swift Transportation Services, LLC filed by Hector Hernandez, Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc., Swift Services Holdings, Inc., Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, Swift Transportation Services, LLC. (Vossler, Christopher)
October 5, 2020 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Shafer, J.)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER remanding matter to Superior Court for the State of Connecticut for reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum of Decision. The Clerk shall send a certified copy of this Order to the Clerk of the Superior Court. 28 U.S.C. 1447. Thereafter, the Clerk shall close this case.Counsel for the removing Defendants is ordered to show cause why the Court should not require "payment of just costs and any actual expenses, including attorney fees, incurred as a result of the removal" within 14 days of the entry of this order. 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/02/2020. (Diamond, Matthew)
September 17, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE re #16 Response to Order to Show Cause, filed by Sandra Castillo. (Cella, Thomas)
September 17, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE TO 14 Order,,, by Hector Hernandez, Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc., Swift Services Holdings, Inc., Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, Swift Transportation Services, LLC filed by Hector Hernandez, Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc., Swift Services Holdings, Inc., Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, Swift Transportation Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Summons), #2 Exhibit (Return of Service))(Vossler, Christopher)
September 3, 2020 Show Cause Response due by 9/17/2020 per Dkt. 14 Order. (Shafer, J.)
September 3, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P. Cella on behalf of Sandra Castillo (Cella, Thomas)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER to Show Cause as to why this case should not be dismissed or remanded. 28 U.S.C. 1441(b)(2) provides that "[a] civil action otherwise removable solely on the basis of the jurisdiction under section 1332(a) of this title may not be removed if any of the parties in interest properly joined and served as defendants is a citizen of the State in which such action is brought." In this case, Defendant Hector Hernandez is a citizen of Connecticut. Accordingly, the removing defendants shall respond by 09/17/2020 as to why this Court has removal jurisdiction over the action. If the defendants do not respond by that date, the Court will exercise its authority to sua sponte dismiss or remand the action for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 09/03/2020. (Diamond, Matthew)
September 2, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #11 Standing Protective Order, #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Swift Services Holdings, Inc., Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, Swift Transportation Services, LLC, Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc., Hector Hernandez, #5 Jury Demand filed by Swift Services Holdings, Inc., Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, Swift Transportation Services, LLC, Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc., Hector Hernandez, #2 Notice (Other), filed by Swift Services Holdings, Inc., Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, Swift Transportation Services, LLC, Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc., Hector Hernandez, #3 Notice (Other), filed by Swift Services Holdings, Inc., Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, Swift Transportation Services, LLC, Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc., Hector Hernandez, #10 Electronic Filing Order, #12 Order Re: Chambers Practices, #4 Notice of Appearance, filed by Swift Services Holdings, Inc., Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, Swift Transportation Services, LLC, Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc., Hector Hernandez, #6 Notice (Other), filed by Swift Services Holdings, Inc., Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, Swift Transportation Services, LLC, Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc., Hector Hernandez, #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Swift Services Holdings, Inc., Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, Swift Transportation Services, LLC, Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc., Hector Hernandez, #7 Notice (Other), filed by Swift Services Holdings, Inc., Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, Swift Transportation Services, LLC, Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc., Hector Hernandez. Signed by Clerk on 9/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Removal Standing Order) (Velez, F.)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/2/2020. (Velez, F.)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/2/2020. (Velez, F.)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/2/2020. (Velez, F.)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2020; Discovery due by 3/4/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 4/8/2021. Signed by Clerk on 9/2/2020. (Velez, F.)
September 2, 2020 Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany)
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hector Hernandez, Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc., Swift Services Holdings, Inc., Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, Swift Transportation Services, LLC. (Vossler, Christopher)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Hector Hernandez, Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc., Swift Services Holdings, Inc., Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, Swift Transportation Services, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Notice to Counsel re Local Rule 5(b)) (Vossler, Christopher)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Hector Hernandez, Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc., Swift Services Holdings, Inc., Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, Swift Transportation Services, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Compliance With Standing Order In Removed Cases) (Vossler, Christopher)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Hector Hernandez, Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc., Swift Services Holdings, Inc., Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, Swift Transportation Services, LLC. (Vossler, Christopher)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Vossler on behalf of Hector Hernandez, Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc., Swift Services Holdings, Inc., Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, Swift Transportation Services, LLC (Vossler, Christopher)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Hector Hernandez, Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc., Swift Services Holdings, Inc., Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, Swift Transportation Services, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Notice of Pending Motions) (Vossler, Christopher)
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE by Hector Hernandez, Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc., Swift Services Holdings, Inc., Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, Swift Transportation Services, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Certificate of Filing and Service of Notice of Removal) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal (Superior Court))(Vossler, Christopher)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hector Hernandez, Swift Services Holdings, Inc., Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, Swift Transportation Services, LLC, Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc. from New Britain Superior Court, case number NB3 HHB CV 20 6061200S. Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACTDC-6070020, filed by Hector Hernandez, Swift Services Holdings, Inc., Swift Transportation Company of Arizona, Swift Transportation Services, LLC, Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons & Complaint)(Vossler, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castillo v. Swift Transportation Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Transportation Services, LLC
Represented By: Christopher M. Vossler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector Hernandez
Represented By: Christopher M. Vossler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M. Vossler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Transportation Company of Arizona
Represented By: Christopher M. Vossler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swift Services Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M. Vossler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Castillo
Represented By: Thomas P. Cella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?