Federal Housing Finance Agency et al v. Ansonia et al
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association and Federal Housing Finance Agency
Defendant: City of Ansonia, David Blackwell, Sr., Arthur J. Davies and Ronda Porrini
Case Number: 3:2020cv01320
Filed: September 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Michael P Shea
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by City of Ansonia, David Blackwell, Sr, Ronda Porrini.(Marini, John Paul)
October 9, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by John Paul Marini on behalf of David Blackwell, Sr, Ronda Porrini (Marini, John Paul)
October 7, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by John Paul Marini on behalf of City of Ansonia (Marini, John Paul)
September 23, 2020 Filing 14 Amended SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal Housing Finance Agency. City of Ansonia served on 9/14/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. (Budinetz, James)
September 18, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal Housing Finance Agency. Arthur J. Davies served on 9/15/2020, answer due 10/6/2020. (Budinetz, James)
September 18, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal Housing Finance Agency. David Blackwell, Sr served on 9/14/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. (Budinetz, James)
September 18, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal Housing Finance Agency. Ronda Porrini served on 9/14/2020, answer due 10/5/2020. (Budinetz, James)
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal Housing Finance Agency. City of Ansonia served on 9/9/2020, answer due 9/30/2020. (Budinetz, James)
September 11, 2020 Filing fee received from McElroy, Deutsch, Mulvaney & Carpenter: $ 400.00, receipt number CTXH00017253 (Peterson, M)
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *City of Ansonia, David Blackwell, Sr, Arthur J. Davies, Ronda Porrini* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *James A. Budinetz* *McElroy, Deutsch, Mulvaney & Carpenter, LLP* *One State Street, 14th Floor* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Peterson, M)
September 8, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federal National Mortgage Association. (Baldwin, Andrew)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #3 Notice of Appearance filed by Federal National Mortgage Association, Docket Annotation, #1 Complaint, filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency, #6 Protective Order, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency Signed by Clerk on 09/08/2020. (Peterson, M)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 09/04/2020. (Peterson, M)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 09/04/2020. (Peterson, M)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/3/2020. Discovery due by 3/6/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 4/10/2021. Signed by Clerk on 09/04/2020. (Peterson, M)
September 4, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew L Baldwin on behalf of Federal National Mortgage Association (Baldwin, Andrew)
September 4, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James A. Budinetz on behalf of Federal Housing Finance Agency, Federal Housing Finance Agency(in its capacity as Conservator for Federal National Mortgage Association) (Budinetz, James)
September 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Federal Housing Finance Agency, Federal Housing Finance Agency(in its capacity as Conservator for Federal National Mortgage Association). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Budinetz, James)
September 4, 2020 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Budinetz, James)
September 4, 2020 Docket Annotation: This case was opened without paying the filing fee of $400.00 or filing a motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Counsel was notified that the payment or IFP motion are due at any of the 3 seats of court for this district by 12:00PM on Tuesday 9/8/2020. (Hushin, Z.)
September 4, 2020 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Oliver, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Housing Finance Agency et al v. Ansonia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Ansonia
Represented By: John Paul Marini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Blackwell, Sr.
Represented By: John Paul Marini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur J. Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronda Porrini
Represented By: John Paul Marini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Andrew L Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Housing Finance Agency
Represented By: James A. Budinetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?