In re: Peralta et al
In Re: Yulissa Vivieca and Gilberto A Peralta
Appellant: Gilberto Peralta
Not Classified By Court: US Trustee
Appellee: Greg Sidoti
Case Number: 3:2020cv01340
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Filing 13 Appellant's BRIEF by Gilberto Peralta. Appellee Brief due by 11/29/2020 (Arcaro, Gregory)
September 30, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE: A record on appeal in the above-entitled matter was transmitted to the District Court by the US Bankruptcy Court on 9/30/2020 and entered on the docket on 9/30/2020 pursuant to Bankruptcy Rules. The Appellant and Appellee shall serve and file their briefs pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 8018. Appellant Brief due by 10/30/2020. Signed by Clerk on 9/30/2020. (Fanelle, N.)
September 30, 2020 Filing 11 USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.)
September 30, 2020 Filing 10 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in Bankruptcy Court: Type of Hearing: Pretrial Conference via Teleconference. Held on 5/19/2020 before Judge Julie A Manning. Court Reporter: Kathleen Price. Unrestricted transcripts may be obtained from Bankruptcy Court. (Fanelle, N.)
September 30, 2020 Filing 9 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in Bankruptcy Court: Type of Hearing: Telephonic Hearing on Pretrial Conference. Held on 4/21/2020 before Judge Julie A Manning. Court Reporter: Janice Russell. Unrestricted transcripts may be obtained from Bankruptcy Court. (Fanelle, N.)
September 30, 2020 Filing 8 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings in Bankruptcy Court: Type of Hearing: Telephonic Hearing on Order to Show Cause. Held on 6/16/2020 before Judge Julie A Manning. Court Reporter: Janice Russell. Unrestricted transcripts may be obtained from Bankruptcy Court. (Fanelle, N.)
September 30, 2020 Filing 7 Transmission of Bankruptcy Appeal Record re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Fanelle, N.)
September 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: A notice of appeal was transmitted by the U.S. Bankruptcy Court on 9/9/2020 and entered on the docket on 9/10/2020. The appellant and appellee shall comply with Bankruptcy Rule 8009. Within 14 days, the appellant shall file a notice with this Court either that appellant has filed with the Bankruptcy Court a designation and statement in accordance with Bankruptcy Rule 8009(a)(1)(B), or that the parties have prepared an agreed statement in accordance with Bankruptcy Rule 8009(d), and attach to the notice a copy of such filing. Failure to comply with this notice may result in the case being dismissed. Designation Notice due by: 9/24/2020. Signed by Clerk on 9/9/2020. (Fanelle, N.)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/9/2020. (Fanelle, N.)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/9/2020. (Fanelle, N.)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/9/2020. (Fanelle, N.)
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 USBC Transmittal Form (Fanelle, N.)
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number(s) 19-51506, 20-05003, filed by Gilberto Peralta. (Attachments: #1 Bankrupcy Order) (Fanelle, N.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Peralta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Yulissa Vivieca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Gilberto A Peralta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Gilberto Peralta
Represented By: Gregory F. Arcaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: US Trustee
Represented By: US Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Greg Sidoti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?