Vegiard v. Hartford Hospital et al
Plaintiff: John Vegiard
Defendant: I.O.L., Mohan Families, Live Nation, Jackson Familie, Family Members of 2017 + 2018 Live Nation Employees, Hartford Police Dept, Wheeler Clinic, Residents of 170 + 178 Park Street 2018, New London YNH Hospital, Jeffrey N. and Hartford Hospital
Case Number: 3:2020cv01453
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Stefan R Underhill
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Filing 13 Letter from John Vegiard Re: Requesting Protected Custody (Attachments: #1 copy of envelope) (Oliver, T.)
November 11, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE: On October 14, 2020, the Clerk's Office mailed to Vegiard instructions for serving the defendants along with the necessary paperwork. As of November 10, 2020, Vegiard has not returned the required papers and, as a result, the U.S. Marshals have not been able to serve any of the defendants except the Hartford Police Department in its official capacity. Vegiard is directed to return the required forms and papers to the Clerk's Office by December 10, 2020. Vegiard should contact the Clerk's Office if he has any questions. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 11/11/2020. (Simon, K.)
November 3, 2020 Filing 11 LETTER MOTION for Protective Order by John Vegiard. Responses due by 11/24/2020 (Attachments: #1 copy of envelope) (Oliver, T.)
October 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by John Vegiard (Attachments: #1 copy of envelope) (Oliver, T.)
October 14, 2020 Filing 9 USM 285 forms together with Summons/Notice of Lawsuit/Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, OPTD, Consent to electronic notice, Motion by pro se litigant to participate in electronic filing, Standing Protective Order, Electronic Filing Order and all instructions mailed to IFP plaintiff to complete and return to Clerk's office. (Oliver, T.)
October 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Protective Order, #5 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint, filed by John Vegiard, #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by John Vegiard, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 10/14/2020.(Oliver, T.)
October 14, 2020 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Hartford Police Dept* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. *John Vegiard* *25 Read Street* *Flr 2* *New Haven, CT 06511*. (Oliver, T.)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 10/14/2020. (Simon, K)
September 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/25/2020 Discovery due by 3/28/2021 Dispositive Motions due by 5/2/2021 Signed by Clerk on 9/24/2020.(Freberg, B)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/24/2020.(Freberg, B)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 9/24/2020.(Freberg, B)
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John Vegiard. (Freberg, B)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Family Members of 2017 + 2018 Live Nation Employees, Hartford Hospital, Hartford Police Dept, I.O.L., Jackson Familie, Live Nation, Mohan Families, Jeffrey N., New London YNH Hospital, Residents of 170 + 178 Park Street 2018, Wheeler Clinic, filed by John Vegiard. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Freberg, B)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vegiard v. Hartford Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I.O.L.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohan Families
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Live Nation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson Familie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Members of 2017 + 2018 Live Nation Employees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Police Dept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wheeler Clinic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Residents of 170 + 178 Park Street 2018
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New London YNH Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey N.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Vegiard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?